Williams v. LaVoie
Plaintiff: Diarbro L Williams
Defendant: Dr LaVoie
Case Number: 2:2020cv00916
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $.29, receipt number GB4689-005713. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (tlf)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/20/2020 re #11 plaintiff's Motion for Extended Time to Pay Filing Fee. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to pay the $0.29 initial partial filing fee is EXTENDED until the end of the day on July 31, 2020. Regarding the plaintiff's issues with permission to pay the initial partial filing fee from his release account, the court's order dated June 29, 2020, dkt. no. 9, specifically allows the plaintiff to pay the initial partial filing fee from his release account; however he may do so only if he does not have sufficient funds in his regular account. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Diarbro Williams and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay initial partial filing fee by Diarbro L Williams. Plaintiff is requesting that the institution pay the initial partial filing fee from his release account. (tlf)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Diarbro L Williams. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/29/2020. On or before 7/20/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $0.29 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Diarbro Williams and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dr LaVoie. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Diarbro L Williams. (lh)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 DOCUMENTS related to GBCl-2020-4021 Inmate Complaint filed by Diarbro L Williams.(tlf)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED Summons Forms submitted by Diarbro L Williams. (tlf)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Diarbro Williams re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Insufficient Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Diarbro L Williams. (lh)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Diarbro L Williams. (lh)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against LaVoie by Diarbro L Williams. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Declaration)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. LaVoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr LaVoie
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diarbro L Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?