Ledford v. Mahal et al
Plaintiff: William N Ledford
Defendant: CO Matueski, William Mc Creedy, James La Belle, Dr Ryan Holzmacher, Dr. David Burnet, Brian Foster, Emily Stadtmueller, Jon E Litscher, Edward F Wall, CO Mahal, Nancy Garcia, Cpt Kyle Tritt, Paul Ludvigson, William Pollard, Cathy Jess, Anthony Meli, Officer Constine, Crystal Marchant, Nancy White, Lori Alsum, Anna Boatwright and Joan Bovee
Case Number: 2:2020cv00946
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION of William Ledford (mac)
August 20, 2020 Filing 45 Supplemental RESPONSE to Motion filed by William N Ledford re #36 MOTION to Dismiss or Revoke In Forma Pauperis Status. (mac)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Plaintiff's motion to file supplemental response to defendants' motion to dismiss or revoke in forma pauperis status (Docket #43 ) is GRANTED. The plaintiff may file a supplemental response on or before September 5, 2020. The defendants may file a supplemental reply within 14 days after the plaintiff files his supplemental response. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Plaintiff) (ds)
July 28, 2020 Filing 44 DECLARATION of William Ledford (mac)
July 28, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to File Supplemental Response to #36 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 9/5/2020. by William N Ledford. (mac)
July 28, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Change of Address as to William N Ledford to Wisconsin Secure Program Facility. (mac)
July 14, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Officer Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller re #36 MOTION to Dismiss or Revoke In Forma Pauperis Status . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Held, Eliot)
July 13, 2020 Filing 40 DECLARATION of William Ledford (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B)(lh)
July 13, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion filed by William N Ledford re #36 MOTION to Dismiss or Revoke In Forma Pauperis Status. (lh)
July 8, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Officer Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Held, Eliot)
June 30, 2020 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (ds)
June 30, 2020 Filing 37 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William N Ledford. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
June 26, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
June 25, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint or MOTION to Revoke In Forma Pauperis Status re #4 Order by Officer Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Held, Eliot). Added MOTION on 6/26/2020 (ds).
June 25, 2020 Filing 35 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Officer Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Held, Eliot)
June 25, 2020 Filing 34 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)
June 25, 2020 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:17-cv-00959. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 25, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov. (ds)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss or transfer venue (dkt. #26 ) is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/24/2020. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 31 Brief in Reply by Defendants Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller in Support of #26 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Held, Eliot),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 30 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff William N. Ledford re: #26 Motion to Dismiss filed by Constine, Matueski, Crystal Marchant, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Emily Stadtmueller (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 29 Declaration of Christine Zuraff filed by Defendants Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller re: #26 Motion to Dismiss (Held, Eliot),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 28 Declaration of Yana Pusich filed by Defendants Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller re: #26 Motion to Dismiss (Held, Eliot),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 27 Declaration of Emily Stadtmueller filed by Defendants Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller re: #26 Motion to Dismiss (Held, Eliot),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS or Transfer by Defendants Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Held, Eliot),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #26 MOTION TO DISMISS or Transfer. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 5/4/2020. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 5/11/2020. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 25 Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Wisconsin Department of Justice. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 24 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller. (Held, Eliot),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Eliot M. Held for Defendants Constine, Nancy Garcia, Mahal, Crystal Marchant, Matueski, Emily Stadtmueller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Held, Eliot),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Emily Stadtmueller, Constine, Crystal Marchant, Mahal, Nancy Garcia, Matueski. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Joan Bovee, David Burnet, Brian Foster, Ryan Holzmacher, Cathy Jess, James La Belle, Jon E. Litscher, Paul Ludvigson, William Mc Creedy, Anthony (Tony) Meli, William Pollard, Kyle Tritt, Edward F. Wall, Nancy White, Lori Alsum and Anna Boatwright. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Plaintiff's motion for screening (dkt. #17 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/23/2020. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Filing 21 Letter from clerk's office in response to #20 letter from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 20 Letter Requesting Status Update by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from clerk's office in response to #16 , #17 , #18 letters from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 Letter to Judge Crabb from plaintiff regarding screening. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 Letter Requesting Status Update by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from plaintiff William Ledford regarding dkt. 15 Text Only Order. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff William Ledford has filed a motion to amend his complaint (dkt. #8 ). At this stage, Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) does not require plaintiff to seek leave of court to amend his complaint, so the motion is GRANTED. As such, the court will take plaintiff's proposed amended complaint under advisement for purposes of screening, as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/18/2019. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Change of Address by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Change of Address by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Clerk's Office in response to #11 letter from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 Letter Requesting Status Update by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Change of Address to Wisconsin Secure Program Facility, by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by plaintiff William Ledford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Prior authorization, #2 Exhibit 2 - Medical progress report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Medical progress report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Blood sugar meal time log, #5 Exhibit 5 - Clinic notes, #6 Exhibit 6 - Prescriber's orders, #7 Exhibit 7 - ICE report, #8 Exhbit 8 - Letter from Lori Alsum, RN) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 8 Motion for leave to file an amended complaint and to add defendants and memorandum of law in support by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk's Office in response to #6 letter from plaintiff. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
January 29, 2018 Filing 6 Letter regarding medical condition and request for a status update by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (jef) Modified docket text on 1/29/2018 (jef). [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
January 8, 2018 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 4.27, receipt number 34690030779. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
December 28, 2017 Filing 5 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-filing Information Packet) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff William N. Ledford assessed an initial partial filing fee of $4.27 assessed due 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 12/28/2017. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (nln),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2017: #1 IPP Calculation) (nln). [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William N. Ledford. (Attachments: #1 Authorization for Release of Institutional Account Information and Payment of the Filing Fee) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William N. Ledford. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Prior Authorization for Therapeutic Level of Care, #2 Exhibit 2 - Progress Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Progress Report, #4 Exhibit 4 - Blood Sugar/Insulin & Meal Time Log, #5 Exhibit 5 - Wound Care Office/Clinic Note Final Report, #6 Exhibit 6 - Prescriber's Orders, #7 Exhibit 7 - ICE Report Complaint Number WCI-2016-5772, #8 Exhibit 8 - Letter from Lori Alsum to William Ledford dated 4/12/16) (nln) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledford v. Mahal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Matueski
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mc Creedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James La Belle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Ryan Holzmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. David Burnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Stadtmueller
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon E Litscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward F Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Mahal
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Garcia
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt Kyle Tritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ludvigson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Meli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Constine
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Marchant
Represented By: Eliot M Held
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Alsum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Boatwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Bovee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William N Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?