May v. State of Wisconsin
Plaintiff: Edith Mae May
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Case Number: 2:2020cv00948
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff. (asc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER re inmate trust account statement from plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, that by the end of the day on August 28, 2020, May must file a certified copy of her trust account statement covering the six-month period preceding the filing of her complaint. If she fails to do so, her case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to her based on her failure to diligently prosecute it. (cc: all counsel,via US Mail to Plaintiff)(ds)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Plaintiff re summary judgment and legal loan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ds) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/27/2020-Exhbits scanned in color) (ds). Modified on 7/27/2020 (ds).
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Edith Mae May. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (ds)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (vkb)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Edith Mae May (vkb)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Edith Mae May (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Mae May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?