Marquette University v. Kuali Inc
Plaintiff: Marquette University
Defendant: Kuali Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00954
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2020 at 11:00 AM (CT) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. A Rule 26(f) report shall filed no later than 9/4/2020. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Kuali Inc.(Cirincione, James)
July 16, 2020 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (lz)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kuali Inc filed by Marquette University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Letter from Kuali to HRSA (Dr. Tumosa))(Long, Kevin)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kuali Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cirincione, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Marquette University. (Krajewski, Brandon)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Marquette University. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Krajewski, Brandon)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Kathleen C. Foster in support of Defendant Kuali, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Renewal, #2 Exhibit B - Master Services Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Professional Services Agreement)(Cirincione, James)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support filed by Kuali Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss . (Cirincione, James)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Kuali Inc. (Cirincione, James)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kuali Inc. (Cirincione, James)
June 26, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kuali Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 20-CV-3081 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3490198) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Milwaukee County Circuit Court Summons and Complaint)(Cirincione, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquette University v. Kuali Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuali Inc
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Represented By: Timothy M Hansen
Represented By: Michael Anderson
Represented By: Victoria Luman
Represented By: Jonathan R Schofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquette University
Represented By: Brandon M Krajewski
Represented By: Kevin M Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?