French et al v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: William J French, Sandra M. French and Sandra M French
Defendant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company and Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv01090
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/11/2020 re #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by the defendants. The court GRANTS the defendants' motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on September 21, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer TO COMPLAINT by Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Brogan, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven H Brogan on behalf of Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven H. Brogan (Brogan, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Nolan Tully on behalf of Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Nolan B. Tully (Tully, Nolan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J O'Driscoll on behalf of Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy J. O'Driscoll (O'Driscoll, Timothy)
August 7, 2020 Due to non-consent this case has been randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (ds)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 8/7/2020 granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Defendants' answer or other response to the complaint is due by September 14, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (aw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kay, Justin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint by Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Kay, Justin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Kay, Justin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin O Kay on behalf of Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Justin O. Kay (Kay, Justin)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Burns, Timothy)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W Ciolko on behalf of Sandra M French, William J French. Attorney(s) appearing: Edward W. Ciolko (Ciolko, Edward)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Exhibits A-C, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement on July 24, 2020 by Ed Souders, Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Company (Burns, Timothy) Modified on 8/3/2020 (ds).
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Exhibits A-C, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement on July 24, 2020 by Ed Souders, The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Burns, Timothy) Modified on 8/3/2020 (ds).
July 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company and Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co.(ds)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Burns, Timothy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Burns, Timothy)
July 20, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The attached summons was not saved in fillable format and cannot be issued electronically. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (ds)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse J Bair on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Jesse J. Bair (Bair, Jesse)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Burns, Timothy)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co, Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company by Sandra M. French, William J French. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3512239) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Outline of Coverage, #2 Exhibit B: Rate Increase Disclosure Form, #3 Exhibit C: Insurance Policy, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burns, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French et al v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin O Kay
Represented By: Timothy J O'Driscoll
Represented By: Nolan Tully
Represented By: Steven H Brogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Long Term Care Insurance Co
Represented By: Justin O Kay
Represented By: Timothy J O'Driscoll
Represented By: Nolan Tully
Represented By: Steven H Brogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J French
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Represented By: Jonathan M Jagher
Represented By: Robert J Wozniak, Jr
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael J Freed
Represented By: Edward W Ciolko
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Jesse J Bair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra M. French
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra M French
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Represented By: Jonathan M Jagher
Represented By: Robert J Wozniak, Jr
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael J Freed
Represented By: Edward W Ciolko
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Jesse J Bair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?