Gorokhovsky v. State Public Defender Office et al
Plaintiff: Vladimir Gorokhovsky and Vladimir M Gorokhovsky
Defendant: State Public Defender Office and Katlyn Pakes
Case Number: 2:2020cv01098
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Late Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law and Facts in Opposition and Objection to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Vladimir M Gorokhovsky. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Gorokhovsky, Vladimir)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 CORRECTED BRIEF in Support filed by Katlyn Pakes, State Public Defender Office re #8 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rice, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Katlyn Pakes, State Public Defender Office re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rice, David)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to #8 Motion to Dismiss and MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE Late Memorandum filed by plaintiff Vladimir M Gorokhovsky (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gorokhovsky, Vladimir) Modified on 9/10/2020 (vkb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF in Support filed by Katlyn Pakes, State Public Defender Office re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Decision and Order from 8.22.18, #2 Exhibit 2 - 6.25.20 Certification Decision Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Dated 6.26.20, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter Dated 7.28.20)(Rice, David)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Katlyn Pakes, State Public Defender Office. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rice, David)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katlyn Pakes - Waiver sent on 7/28/2020; State Public Defender Office - Waiver sent on 7/18/2020 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rice, David) Modified on 7/30/2020 (vkb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David C Rice on behalf of Katlyn Pakes, State Public Defender Office. Attorney(s) appearing: David C. Rice (Rice, David)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Order of Substitution of Judge Pamela Pepper by Vladimir Gorokhovsky. (Gorokhovsky, Vladimir)
July 27, 2020 Case randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (ds)
July 26, 2020 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS by Vladimir Gorokhovsky to proceed before the Magistrate / Amended Objection. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gorokhovsky, Vladimir)
July 26, 2020 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS by Vladimir Gorokhovsky to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gorokhovsky, Vladimir)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Order for Leave of this Court to allow the Plaintiff to use his PACER.GOV e-filling privileges for any and all further filling with this Court in the matter sub judice by Vladimir Gorokhovsky. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gorokhovsky, Vladimir)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT at Law against All Defendants by Vladimir GCorokhovsky. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number BWIEDC-3513675) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gorokhovsky, Vladimir) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl). Modified on 7/20/2020 (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorokhovsky v. State Public Defender Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Public Defender Office
Represented By: David C Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katlyn Pakes
Represented By: David C Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Gorokhovsky
Represented By: Vladimir M Gorokhovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir M Gorokhovsky
Represented By: Vladimir M Gorokhovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?