Woods v. Corr et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence C Woods, Jr
Defendant: Jacob D Corr and Hanna Ritchie Kolberg
Case Number: 2:2020cv01118
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $6.02, receipt number MK4689-083847. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (bx)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/13/2020 #7 plaintiff's motion for extension of time to pay initial partial filing fee. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to pay his initial partial filing fee, or notify the court as to why he is unable to pay the fee, is EXTENDED until the end of the day on September 11, 2020. If the plaintiff fails to pay the fee or notify the court by the due date, the court may dismiss this case without further notice. Alternatively, the plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss the case to avoid having to pay the $350 filing fee. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Lawrence Woods at Milwaukee County Jail; Sheriff Lucas; Dennis Brand-Sheriff's Office)(cb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Lawrence C Woods, Jr. (vkb)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by plaintiff Lawrence C Woods, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (vkb)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/22/2020. On or before 8/12/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $6.02 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Lawrence Woods at Milwaukee County Jail; Sheriff Lucas, Dennis Brand-Sheriff's Office)(cb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (vkb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by plaintiff Lawrence C Woods, Jr. (vkb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Lawrence C Woods, Jr. (vkb)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT filed by Lawrence C Woods, Jr. (vkb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Corr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob D Corr
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna Ritchie Kolberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence C Woods, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?