Cave Enterprises Operations LLC v. V&J Foods Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC and Cave Enterprises Operations LLC
Defendant: Valerie R. Daniels-Carter, V&J Foods Inc and Valerie R Daniels-Carter
Case Number: 2:2020cv01119
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Cave Enterprises Operations LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Vallas, David)
September 3, 2020 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 7 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
July 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to Valerie R Daniels-Carter, V&J Foods Inc. (mlm)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Cave Enterprises Operations LLC (Vallas, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Cave Enterprises Operations LLC (Vallas, David)
July 23, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (mlm)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Vallas, David)
July 22, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC (Vallas, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC (Vallas, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet by Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC re #1 Complaint. (Vallas, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC. (Filing Fee PAID $400) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Vallas, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cave Enterprises Operations LLC v. V&J Foods Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cave Enterprises Operations, LLC
Represented By: David P Vallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cave Enterprises Operations LLC
Represented By: David P Vallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie R. Daniels-Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V&J Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie R Daniels-Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?