Hutchinson v. Kelling et al
Plaintiff: Robert J Hutchinson
Defendant: Esserlaw LLC, American Association for Laboratory Accreditation Inc, Oakton Avenue Law Offices SC, Peter J Plaushines, Cramer Multhauf & Hammes LLP, Metallurgical Associates Inc, Dorothy H Dey, Wendy L Tefelske, Thomas C Tefelske and Jeffrey Kelling
Case Number: 2:2020cv01264
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeffrey Kelling - Waiver sent on 8/24/2020. (ds)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Esserlaw LLC - Waiver sent on 8/24/2020. (ds)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dorothy H Dey - Waiver sent on 8/24/2020. (ds)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert J Hutchinson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(ds)
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE Statement by Robert J Hutchinson. (ds)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by American Association for Laboratory Accreditation Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cornwell, Judith)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by American Association for Laboratory Accreditation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cornwell, Judith)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Association for Laboratory Accreditation Inc - Waiver sent on 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cornwell, Judith)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant American Association for Laboratory Accreditation Inc requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov; pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (ds)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Judith G Cornwell on behalf of American Association for Laboratory Accreditation Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Judith G. Cornwell (Cornwell, Judith)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Cramer Multhauf & Hammes LLP, Metallurgical Associates Inc, Peter J Plaushines, Thomas C Tefelske, Wendy L Tefelske. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fernholz, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Robert J Hutchinson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service)(ds)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Cramer Multhauf & Hammes LLP, Metallurgical Associates Inc, Peter J Plaushines, Thomas C Tefelske, Wendy L Tefelske. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fernholz, Matthew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dorothy H Dey, Esserlaw LLC, Jeffrey Kelling. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Johnson, Alyssa)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants, Jeffrey Kelling, Dorothy H Dey, and Esserlaw LLC requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov. (ds)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dorothy H Dey, Esserlaw LLC, Jeffrey Kelling (Johnson, Alyssa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Dorothy H Dey, Esserlaw LLC, Jeffrey Kelling. (Johnson, Alyssa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa A Johnson on behalf of Dorothy H Dey, Esserlaw LLC, Jeffrey Kelling. Attorney(s) appearing: Alyssa A. Johnson (Johnson, Alyssa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah D Fiedler on behalf of Dorothy H Dey, Esserlaw LLC, Jeffrey Kelling. Attorney(s) appearing: Noah D. Fiedler (Fiedler, Noah)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas C Tefelske - Waiver sent on 8/24/2020; Peter J Plaushines - Waiver sent on 8/24/2020; Wendy L Tefelske - Waiver sent on 8/24/2020; Cramer Multhauf & Hammes LLP - Waiver sent on 8/24/2020; Metallurgical Associates Inc - Waiver sent on 8/24/2020. (Fernholz, Matthew)
August 27, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants, Cramer Multhauf & Hammes LLP, Metallurgical Associates Inc, Peter J Plaushines, Thomas C Tefelske, Wendy L Tefelske requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov. (ds)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Fernholz on behalf of Cramer Multhauf & Hammes LLP, Metallurgical Associates Inc, Peter J Plaushines, Thomas C Tefelske, Wendy L Tefelske. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew M. Fernholz (Fernholz, Matthew)
August 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Service Packet sent via US Mail to Plaintiff this date. (ds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to plainitff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (asc)
August 17, 2020 FILING FEE Received: $400.00, receipt number MK4689-083593. (ds)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Robert J Hutchinson. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutchinson v. Kelling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esserlaw LLC
Represented By: Noah D Fiedler
Represented By: Alyssa A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Association for Laboratory Accreditation Inc
Represented By: Judith G Cornwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakton Avenue Law Offices SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J Plaushines
Represented By: Matthew M Fernholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cramer Multhauf & Hammes LLP
Represented By: Matthew M Fernholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metallurgical Associates Inc
Represented By: Matthew M Fernholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy H Dey
Represented By: Noah D Fiedler
Represented By: Alyssa A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy L Tefelske
Represented By: Matthew M Fernholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C Tefelske
Represented By: Matthew M Fernholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Kelling
Represented By: Noah D Fiedler
Represented By: Alyssa A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?