Birkley v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Syris T Birkley, O and O'Syris Lord Birk-Ail-El
Defendant: D Roberts, Lt Jones, CO Walters, Lt Seal, CO Berry, Lt Ruiz, CO Starks, Lt Seel and CO Hooks
Case Number: 2:2020cv01274
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED Amended Complaint filed by O'Syris Lord Birk-Ail-El. (jcl)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/30/20 that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee #2 is GRANTED. Guards Hooks and Starks are ADDED as defendants. Plaintiff's motion to substitute #7 is GRANTED in part. The clerk shall correct the spelling on the docket from Lt Seal to Lt Seel. Plaintiff's motion to add tort #8 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to amend the complaint to add a retaliation claim against Lieutenant Jackson #10 is DENIED. His request to update the spelling of his name is GRANTED. The clerk is DIRECTED to update the spelling of the plaintiffs name to OSyris Lord Birk-Ali-El. A copy of the complaint and this order have been electronically transmitted to Milwaukee County for service on defendants Hooks and Stark. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, Sheriff, Brand) (jad)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Syris T Birkley. (jcl)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Syris T Birkley. (bx)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/2/20 that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4), the plaintiff will not be required to pay an initial partial filing fee. If he wishes to voluntarily dismiss this action to avoid the possibility of incurring a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), the plaintiff shall so notify the court within 21 days of the date of this order. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, warden)(jad)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Order Demanding to Add TORT to cases by Syris T Birkley. (bx)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute by Syris T Birkley. (bx)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Syris T Birkley. (bx)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Syris T Birkley. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (bx)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Syris T. Birkley re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (bx)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Incomplete Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Syris T Birkley. (bx)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Syris T Birkley. (bx)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury filed against All Defendants by Syris T Birkley. (bx)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birkley v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syris T Birkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Syris Lord Birk-Ail-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Jones
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Seel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?