Bryans et al v. Titan Spine Inc et al
Plaintiff: James ABRAMOWSKI, Kade Huntsman, M.D., CHENG-LUN SOO, M.D., Andrew Bryans, Kade Huntsman MD and Cheng-Lun Soo MD
Defendant: SOUTHLAKE EQUITY GROUP, KEVIN GEMAS, Peter ULLRICH, M.D., RAGAN CHENEY, THOMAS KEENE, TITAN SPINE, INC., MEDTRONIC, INC., Peter Ullrich MD, Medtronic Inc, Ragan Cheny and Titan Spine Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01281
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Case Terminated. Certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to Milwaukee County Circuit Court via US Mail. (amb)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/27/2020 re #6 Stipulation to Remand. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation to remand. The court ORDERS that this case is REMANDED to Milwaukee County Circuit Court. The court further ORDERS that a certified copy of the remand order and a certified copy of the docket be sent to Milwaukee County Circuit Court. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Remand by Medtronic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Remand)(Peterson, David)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David G Peterson on behalf of MEDTRONIC, INC.. Attorney(s) appearing: David R. Marshall (Peterson, David)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by MEDTRONIC, INC.. (Peterson, David)
August 19, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been added - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. Capitalization, punctuation, and addresses removed from party names - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Removed duplicate text for description of documents attached to the notice of removal. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (amb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MEDTRONIC, INC. (Peterson, David)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MEDTRONIC, INC. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020CV004508 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3544840) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson, David) Modified on 8/21/2020 (amb).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by David G Peterson on behalf of MEDTRONIC, INC.. Attorney(s) appearing: David G. Peterson (Peterson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryans et al v. Titan Spine Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHLAKE EQUITY GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN GEMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter ULLRICH, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAGAN CHENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS KEENE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITAN SPINE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDTRONIC, INC.
Represented By: David G Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Ullrich MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Inc
Represented By: David G Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ragan Cheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titan Spine Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James ABRAMOWSKI
Represented By: Barry R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kade Huntsman, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHENG-LUN SOO, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Bryans
Represented By: Barry R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kade Huntsman MD
Represented By: Barry R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheng-Lun Soo MD
Represented By: Barry R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?