Faulkner v. US Foods Inc et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Faulkner, United Healthcare Insurance Company, Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation and American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI
Defendant: Trans-Porte, Inc., US Foods, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company, Jean Carlos Flores-Rivera, Trans-Porte Inc and US Foods Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01295
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Jean Carlos Flores-Rivera.(Watson, Brian)
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans-Porte Inc.(Watson, Brian)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by US Foods Inc.(Watson, Brian)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Watson, Brian)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Zachary Faulkner. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wier, Andrew)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Watson, Brian)
September 15, 2020 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to all parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
August 24, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Defendants. Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (Watson, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Watson, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Trans-Porte, Inc.. (Watson, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by US Foods, Inc.. (Watson, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian O'Connor Watson on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Brian O. Watson (Watson, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company, Trans-Porte, Inc., US Foods, Inc., Jean Carlos Flores-Rivera from Kenosha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020cv000644 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3547528) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 DISREGARD. SEE #2 . NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company, Trans-Porte, Inc., US Foods, Inc., Jean Carlos Flores-Rivera from Kenosha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2020cv000644 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3547476)(Watson, Brian) Modified on 8/25/2020 (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faulkner v. US Foods Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans-Porte, Inc.
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Carlos Flores-Rivera
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans-Porte Inc
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Foods Inc
Represented By: Brian O'Connor Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Faulkner
Represented By: Andrew S Wier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew S Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana Wisconsin Health Organization Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company SI
Represented By: Rick J Mundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?