Benotch v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: Leah Benotch
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc., CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Teva Women's Health LLC, The Cooper Companies Inc, Teva Women's Health Inc, Cooper Surgical Inc and Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01296
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/14/2020 re #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 4, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 14, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to all parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellison F Hitt on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Ellison F. Hitt (Hitt, Ellison)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION (Joint) for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Sullivan, W)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by W Patrick Sullivan on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: W. Patrick Sullivan (Sullivan, W)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Benotch. Teva Women's Health LLC served on 9/23/2020. (Kassan, Randi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Benotch. Teva Women's Health Inc served on 9/23/2020. (Kassan, Randi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Benotch. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 9/23/2020. (Kassan, Randi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Benotch. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc served on 9/23/2020. (Kassan, Randi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Benotch. Cooper Surgical Inc served on 9/23/2020. (Kassan, Randi)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Benotch. The Cooper Companies Inc served on 9/23/2020. (Kassan, Randi)
August 24, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. Do not add addresses for any party and do not add punctuation to party names. Also, The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website. In the future, please use the fillable form found on our website. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (vkb)
August 24, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
August 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (vkb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Leah Benotch TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC (Kassan, Randi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Leah Benotch TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. (Kassan, Randi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Leah Benotch TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS, USA, INC. (Kassan, Randi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Leah Benotch COOPERSURGICAL, INC. (Kassan, Randi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Leah Benotch THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. (Kassan, Randi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Leah Benotch TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. (Kassan, Randi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 ATTACHMENTS Civil Cover Sheet by Leah Benotch re #1 Complaint,. (Kassan, Randi)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against CooperSurgical, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, The Cooper Companies, Inc. by Leah Benotch. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3547653)(Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benotch v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Ellison F Hitt
Represented By: W Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health LLC
Represented By: Ellison F Hitt
Represented By: W Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies Inc
Represented By: Ellison F Hitt
Represented By: W Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health Inc
Represented By: Ellison F Hitt
Represented By: W Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Surgical Inc
Represented By: Ellison F Hitt
Represented By: W Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc
Represented By: Ellison F Hitt
Represented By: W Patrick Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Benotch
Represented By: Randi A Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?