Bird v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Plaintiff: Barbara Bird
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd and Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01309
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/14/2020. The defendant's Motion for a Stay of All Proceedings Pending a Decision on MDL Centralization is GRANTED. (ECF No. #17 ). The defendant's Stipulated Motion for Extension to File an Answer/Other Responsive Pleading (ECF No. #17 ) is GRANTED, thereby permitting defendant to file its responsive pleading within seven days of the expiration of the order staying this case. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
October 14, 2020 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (mlm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Other Responsive Pleading Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE STATING NO MEMORANDUM, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brew, Sarah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brew, Sarah)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The court finding good cause, the Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion for an Extension of Time (ECF No. #14 ) is granted. The new schedule is as follows: The defendant shall file its Answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than October 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/29/2020. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Responsive Pleading by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE STATING NO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT WILL BE FILED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brew, Sarah)
September 28, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc re #12 MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING A DECISION ON MDL CENTRALIZATION . (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATION OF SARAH L. BREW, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Brew, Sarah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS PENDING A DECISION ON MDL CENTRALIZATION by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brew, Sarah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Brew, Sarah)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah L Brew on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Sarah L. Brew (Brew, Sarah)
September 25, 2020 Based upon the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. #9 ) and pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) the following parties have been dismissed: Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Ortho LLC and Janssen Research & Development LLC terminated. (mlm)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Barbara Bird. (Dickinson, Erin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Barbara Bird. (Dickinson, Erin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Barbara Bird. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Dickinson, Erin)
September 15, 2020 SECOND NOTICE to PLAINTIFF - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (mlm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Bird. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 9/10/2020. (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Bird. Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc served on 9/10/2020. (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Bird. Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC served on 9/10/2020. (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Bird. Janssen Ortho LLC served on 9/10/2020. (Cohen, Jonathan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Cohen on behalf of Barbara Bird. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan B. Cohen (Cohen, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. (mlm)
August 25, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Barbara Bird. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3550430) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, #4 Summons Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #5 Summons Janssen Research & Development LLC, #6 Summons Janssen Ortho LLC, #7 Summons Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #8 Summons Teva Pharmaceutical USA Inc, #9 Summons Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc)(Dickinson, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bird v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Sarah L Brew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Bird
Represented By: Erin K Dickinson
Represented By: Charles J Crueger
Represented By: Jonathan Cohen
Represented By: Krista K Baisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?