Johnson Level & Tool Mgf Co Inc v. Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc
Plaintiff: Johnson Level & Tool Mgf. Co., Inc. and Johnson Level & Tool Mgf Co Inc
Defendant: Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc. f/k/a 158104 Canada Inc. and Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01379
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/15/2020. Upon consideration of #8 the parties' Stipulation to Extend, the Court hereby ADOPTS that Stipulation. Defendant must file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before 11/16/2020.(cc: all counsel)(McNulty, Ashley)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by All Defendants. (Kelley, Olivia)
September 25, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Johnson Level & Tool Mgf Co Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Harvey, Patrick)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J Liotta on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey J. Liotta (Liotta, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc answer due 10/19/2020. (llc)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving Stipulation #5 filed by Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 9/10/2020. Defendant's answer due October 19, 2020. (cc: all counsel)(llc)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint)(Kelley, Olivia)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia M Kelley on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Olivia M. Kelley (Kelley, Olivia)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint on September 9, 2020 by Jeffrey J. Liotta (Harvey, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William E McCardell on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: William E McCardell (McCardell, William)
September 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc. (asc)
September 8, 2020 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. The disclosure statement should be filed as a separate document and not as an attachment to the initiating document. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
September 4, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Declaratory Judgment with Jury Demand; against Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc. f/k/a 158104 Canada Inc. by Johnson Level & Tool Mgf. Co., Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3562657) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Supplement Johnson Level & Tool Mfg. Co. Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit A - Johnson License Agreement 1-8-20)(Harvey, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Level & Tool Mgf Co Inc v. Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Level & Tool Mgf. Co., Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Level & Tool Mgf Co Inc
Represented By: Patrick M Harvey
Represented By: Margaret K Heitkamp
Represented By: Bruce G Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc. f/k/a 158104 Canada Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Level & Tool (Canada) Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey J Liotta
Represented By: Olivia M Kelley
Represented By: William E McCardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?