Design Basics LLC et al v. Joseph Scott Homes LLC et al
Plaintiff: Design Basics LLC, Plan Pros, Inc. and Plan Pros Inc
Defendant: Joseph Scott Homes, LLC, JMJ RE Holdings LLC, Michael S Lawrence, Joseph Scott Real Estate LLC, James Joseph Fuchs and Joseph Scott Homes LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01389
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Brett Ludwig. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal regarding a Copyright. (via US mail to Register of Copyrights). (mlm) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/13/2020) (mlm).
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Gravino, Marc)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Holevas on behalf of James Joseph Fuchs, JMJ RE Holdings LLC, Joseph Scott Homes LLC, Joseph Scott Real Estate LLC, Michael S Lawrence. Attorney(s) appearing: John J. Holevas (Holevas, John)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Gravino, Marc)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M Huotari on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Joel M. Huotari (Huotari, Joel)
September 30, 2020 NOTICE to ALL PARTIES - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (mlm)
September 30, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc C Gravino on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Marc C. Gravino (Gravino, Marc)
September 21, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Hopkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael T. Hopkins (Hopkins, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed by Joseph Fuchs, #2 Exhibit Executed for Joseph Scott Real Estate, #3 Exhibit Executed for JMJ, #4 Exhibit Executed for Defendant Lawrence)(LeJune, Dana)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against All Defendants with Jury Demand; against All Plaintiffs by Design Basics LLC, Plan Pros, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3563936) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Case Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Trenton, #3 Exhibit 2 - Harrisburg, #4 Exhibit 3 - Tolefson, #5 Exhibit 4 - Shawnee, #6 Exhibit 5 - Laverton, #7 Exhibit 6 - Bloom, #8 Exhibit 7 - Design Basics CR Notice, #9 Exhibit 8 - Infringing Advertisements, #10 Exhibit 9 - Customer Order History)(LeJune, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics LLC et al v. Joseph Scott Homes LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Scott Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMJ RE Holdings LLC
Represented By: John J Holevas
Represented By: Joel M Huotari
Represented By: Marc C Gravino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Lawrence
Represented By: John J Holevas
Represented By: Joel M Huotari
Represented By: Marc C Gravino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Scott Real Estate LLC
Represented By: John J Holevas
Represented By: Joel M Huotari
Represented By: Marc C Gravino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Joseph Fuchs
Represented By: John J Holevas
Represented By: Joel M Huotari
Represented By: Marc C Gravino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Scott Homes LLC
Represented By: John J Holevas
Represented By: Joel M Huotari
Represented By: Marc C Gravino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics LLC
Represented By: Dana A LeJune
Represented By: Michael T. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plan Pros, Inc.
Represented By: Dana A LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plan Pros Inc
Represented By: Dana A LeJune
Represented By: Michael T. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?