Taylor v. Potts et al
Plaintiff: George Taylor
Defendant: Capt Baumann, Bost, Dr LaVoie, Sgt Uitenbroek, CO Walton, John or Jane Doe, Staeven, Rachel Matushak, CO Elrke, CO Potts, CO Vertz, Hannah Utter and CO Wisniewski
Case Number: 2:2020cv01509
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $45.99, receipt number MK4689-84617. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (bx)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee by George Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amb)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting motion for extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 11-10-20. Partial filing fee due November 30, 2020. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(Dries, Stephen)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to pay initial partial fling fee by George Taylor. (mac)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST by George Taylor for status as to prisoner trust account statement. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Trust Account)(lh)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that on or before 11/12/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 45.99 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 10/22/2020. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to plaintiff and warden)(amb)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from the Clerk to George Taylor regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by George Taylor. (mac)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of George Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(mac)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Findings of Fact by George Taylor (mac)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by George Taylor re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (mac)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by George Taylor. (mac)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by George Taylor. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to George Taylor re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (mac)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by George Taylor. (mac)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by George Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Potts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr LaVoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Uitenbroek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staeven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Matushak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Elrke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Potts
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Vertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Utter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?