Walker v. Serrano et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Walker
Defendant: Sieanna Edwards, CO Matushak, John Kind, Does, Warden Radtke, Michael Jean, R.N. Serrano, Sgt Rozmarynoski and Andrew Wickman
Case Number: 2:2020cv01555
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 21 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael Jean, Matushak, Serrano. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bachhuber, Rachel)
October 8, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
October 8, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00520. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendants' unopposed motion to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Dkt. #15 , is GRANTED. The parties agree, and defendants' evidence shows, that venue is proper only in the Eastern District. Accordingly, this case is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/7/2020. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiff Jerome Walker re: #15 Motion to Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. (aom),(ps) Modified on 10/1/2020 (jef). [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS or Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 10/13/2020. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 10/20/2020. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Jodie Perttu filed by Defendants Michael Jean, Matushak, Serrano re: #15 Motion to Dismiss (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS or Transfer Venue to the Eastern District of Wisconsin by Defendants Michael Jean, Matushak, Serrano. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER by Defendants Michael Jean, Matushak, Serrano. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk's Office in response to plaintiff's #12 submission. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 A Motion to Fix Money Issue by Plaintiff Jerome Walker. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit, with respect to the defendants the Wisconsin Department of Justice has accepted service for, plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Department. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendants Michael Jean, Matushak, Serrano. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel Lee Bachhuber for Defendants Michael Jean, Matushak, Serrano. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Sieanna Edwards, Serrano, Michael Jean, Matushak and Does. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Rozmarynoski, Andrew Wickman, John Kind and Radtke. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/30/2020. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Plaintiff Jerome Walker enclosing check in the amount of $37.90. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Warden PLRA Letter. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Partial Filing fee received: $200.00, receipt number 34690037074. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 37.90 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/16/2020. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jerome Walker. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Jerome Walker (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff submit $400 Filing Fee or Motion for IFP w/ Trust Fund Account Statement by 6/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/08/2020. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Jerome Walker. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Serrano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sieanna Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Matushak
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Radtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jean
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.N. Serrano
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Rozmarynoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?