Brown v. Milwaukee Secure Detention Facillity
Plaintiff: Dewitt D Brown
Defendant: Milwaukee Secure Detention Facillity
Case Number: 2:2020cv01671
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $2.96, receipt number MK4689-84794. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (bx)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/6/2020. On or before 12/4/2020 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $2.96 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Dewitt Brown and Warden at Milwaukee Secure Detention Facility)(cb)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dewitt D Brown. (asc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dewitt D Brown. (asc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Milwaukee Secure Detention Facillity by Dewitt D Brown. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Milwaukee Secure Detention Facillity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewitt D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Secure Detention Facillity
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?