Connect Insurance Agency Inc et al v American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc
Plaintiff: Connect Insurance Agency Inc and Connect MGA LLC
Defendant: American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01700
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the parties to file a status report by January 29, 2021, signed by Judge William C. Griesbach on 12/22/2020. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
December 22, 2020 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 09:30 AM is removed from the court calendar at the request of the parties ( #18 Letter). (cc: all counsel) (tlf)
December 18, 2020 Filing 28 LETTER from George Burnett to Judge Griesbach. (Burnett, George)
December 10, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by George Burnett on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: George Burnett (Burnett, George)
December 10, 2020 Filing 26 DOCUMENT REFILED. NOTICE of Appearance by George Burnett on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: George Burnett (Burnett, George) Modified on 12/10/2020 (tlf).
December 8, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2020 at 09:30 AM (CT) before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) at least two days prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be re-scheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov (cc: all counsel)(mac)
November 17, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge William C Griesbach. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
November 16, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Wisconsin, Green Bay Division by American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc. (Tsao, Naikang)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #24 motion signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 11-16-20. Clerk is to reassign case to Green Bay Division. (cc: all counsel)(Dries, Stephen)
November 12, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER to Sara Ann Brown regarding ECF registration and Admission (jcl)
November 12, 2020 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00849. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 12, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #15 Amended Motion to Transfer. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (lt) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc., re #15 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin filed by Defendant American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Connect Insurance Agency, Inc., Connect MGA, LLC, re #15 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin filed by Defendant American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony Icenogle, #2 Declaration of Nancy Galvan, #3 Declaration of David E. Smith, #4 Declaration of Kathleen Hutchinson, #5 Declaration of Jenny Hofmann-McGraw)(Icenogle, Anthony) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin by Connect Insurance Agency, Inc., Connect MGA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Response)(Icenogle, Anthony) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Transfer is due October 23, 2020. entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (gc) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING this case to the Austin Docket of the Honorable James Nowlin, Senior United States District Judge, for all purposes. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Amended MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Chris M. Salemi, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Tina Holewinski, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle M. Jensen, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Jill Fochs, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Mary K. Boersma, #6 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara) Modified on 10/13/2020 (lt). [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Chris M. Salemi, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Tina Holenwinski, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle M. Jensen, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Jill Fochs, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Mary K. Boersma, #6 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Naikang Tsao to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sara Ann Brown on behalf of Naikang Tsao ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13880973) by on behalf of American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Connect Insurance Agency, Inc., Connect MGA, LLC. (Icenogle, Anthony) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Connect MGA, LLC. (Icenogle, Anthony) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties Pursuant to Fed.R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Connect Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Icenogle, Anthony) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with state court pleadings . (Brown, Sara) Modified on 8/17/2020 (lt). [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc..(Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Report on Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Original Petition. (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Naikang Tsao to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13863537), filed by American Family Connect Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Citation, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Service of Process, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Naikang Tsao, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Sara) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 14, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) [Transferred from txwd on 11/12/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connect Insurance Agency Inc et al v American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connect Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: Anthony Lee Icenogle
Represented By: George Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connect MGA LLC
Represented By: Anthony Lee Icenogle
Represented By: George Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Connect Insurance Agency Inc
Represented By: Sara Ann Brown
Represented By: Naikang Tsao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?