Gepner v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Plaintiff: Lucas Gepner
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N A
Case Number: 2:2020cv01716
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing : Due to the Notice of Settlement #12 , the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 10:00 AM has been removed from the Court's calendar. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
January 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (Court, Benjamin)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 10:00 AM By Telephone before Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 1/25/2021. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 888-636-3807 and enter access code 3289363# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(kah) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/5/2021) (kah).
January 4, 2021 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (kah)
January 3, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 1/13/21 (jh)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 1/3/20. Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED. The time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED to 1/13/21. (cc: all counsel)(jh)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Court, Benjamin)
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (Court, Benjamin)
December 10, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: answer due 12/30/20. (jh)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 12/10/20. Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. The time for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED to 12/30/20. (cc: all counsel)(jh)
December 10, 2020 NOTICE from the clerk to defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (Court, Benjamin)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J Court on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. Attorney(s) appearing: Benjamin J. Court (Court, Benjamin)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucas Gepner. JPMorgan Chase Bank N A served on 11/18/2020. (Gale, Elliot)
November 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank N A. (kah)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lucas Gepner. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Gale, Elliot)
November 16, 2020 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Lucas Gepner. (Gale, Elliot)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against JPMorgan Chase Bank N A by Lucas Gepner. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3637643) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gale, Elliot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gepner v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Gepner
Represented By: Elliot W Gale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N A
Represented By: Benjamin J Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?