Williams v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Todd Alexander Williams
Defendant: Sgt Villajuan and CO Williams
Case Number: 2:2020cv01782
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Todd Alexander Williams. Case dismissed. Docket sheet sent to plaintiff indicating closed case. (amb)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/3/2020. On or before 1/4/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $55.15 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to Warden and Todd Williams at Milwaukee Secure Detention Facility)(cb)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Todd Alexander Williams. (amb)
December 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Todd Alexander Williams. (amb)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Todd Alexander Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Villajuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Williams
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Alexander Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?