McClain v. Lucas et al
Plaintiff: Spencer R McClain
Defendant: Wellpath Headquarters, Lt Tyler, Milwaukee County Criminal Justice Facility, County of Milwaukee, Deputy Inspector Aaron Dobson, Unknown, Aramark Restaurant Supply Store, John Zillmer, William Duckert, Earnell R Lucas, Aramark World Headquarters and Doctor English
Case Number: 2:2020cv01798
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $23.00, receipt number MK4689-26QSA47M. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Spencer R McClain. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Spencer R McClain. (blr)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that on or before 1/7/21 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 23.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 12/8/20. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, sheriff and Dennis Brand) (MP)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the consent/refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee be filed within 21 days. (kah)
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Spencer R McClain. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(kah)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 INDIGENCY AFFIDAVIT. (kah)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Spencer R McClain. (kah)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against Aramark Restaurant Supply Store, Aramark World Headquarters, County of Milwaukee, Aaron Dobson, William Duckert, Doctor English, Earnell R Lucas, Milwaukee County Criminal Justice Facility, Lt Tyler, Unknown, Wellpath Headquarters, John Zillmer by Spencer R McClain. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClain v. Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer R McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Criminal Justice Facility
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555, 2241
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Milwaukee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Inspector Aaron Dobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Restaurant Supply Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zillmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Duckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earnell R Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark World Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?