Turner-Harris v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Kenneath Turner-Harris
Defendant: John Doe, PCT Joe Jezwineski and Captain Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv01815
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $90.24, receipt number MK4689-085062. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kenneath Turner-Harris. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from the Clerk to Kenneath Turner-Harris regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/9/2020.On or before 1/8/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $90.24 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, via mail to Warden and Kenneath Turner at Oshkosh Correctional Institution)(cb)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Kenneath Turner-Harris re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenneath Turner-Harris. (lh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kenneath Turner-Harris. (lh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Kenneath Turner-Harris. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Ex A-E)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner-Harris v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCT Joe Jezwineski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Johnson
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneath Turner-Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?