Key v. Scullion et al
Plaintiff: D'Angelo O Key
Defendant: Ryan Meyers, CO Mesmer, CO Collins, Officer Matthew Scullion and CO Eagleberger
Case Number: 2:2020cv01821
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Brett Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Brett Ludwig. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (mlm)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address as to D'Angelo O Key. On 1/12/2021 Mr. Key will be released from prison. His new address is 4057 North 19th Street, Milwaukee, WI 53209. (mlm)
January 4, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $10.88, receipt number MK4689-085049. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 12/21/2020 that on or before 1/11/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 10.88 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(mlm)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by D'Angelo O Key. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cav)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from D'Angelo Key regarding filing fee and trust account statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cav)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by D'Angelo O Key. (tlf)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to D'Angelo Key re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by D'Angelo O Key AND notice of release date of 1/12/2021. (lh)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by D'Angelo O Key. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked exhibits, #2 cover letter)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key v. Scullion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Angelo O Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Mesmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Matthew Scullion
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Eagleberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?