Purifoy v. Bellile
Petitioner: Randy D Purifoy
Respondent: Doug Bellile
Case Number: 2:2020cv01822
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (kah)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Doug Bellile. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kumfer, Lisa)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa E Kumfer on behalf of Doug Bellile. Attorney(s) appearing: Lisa E.F. Kumfer (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kumfer, Lisa)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Doug Bellile (Collins, Winn)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 1/8/2021. The Respondent shall answer/respond within 60 days. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(kah)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Randy D Purifoy. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (amb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Randy D Purifoy. (Filing Fee PAID $5) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibits)(amb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purifoy v. Bellile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy D Purifoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Doug Bellile
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Represented By: Lisa E Kumfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?