Mid-South AG Equipment Inc v. Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC
Plaintiff: Mid-South AG Equipment, Inc. and Mid-South AG Equipment Inc
Defendant: Wacker Neuson Sales Americas, LLC and Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01899
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC. (Wuest, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC re #13 MOTION to Dismiss . (Wuest, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant Wacker Neuson Sales Americas, LLC's Motion to Dismiss)(Wuest, Matthew)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/13/21. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge Lynn Adelman no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mid-South AG Equipment Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Olson, Joseph)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/11/21. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bezier, Nicholas)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(Bezier, Nicholas)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Wuest on behalf of Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew M. Wuest (Wuest, Matthew)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John L Kirtley on behalf of Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: John L. Kirtley (Kirtley, John)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Bezier on behalf of Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Nicholas J. Bezier (Bezier, Nicholas)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid-South AG Equipment Inc. Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC served on 12/28/2020. (Olson, Joseph)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC. (bx)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Mid-South AG Equipment, Inc. (Olson, Joseph)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Mid-South AG Equipment, Inc.. (Olson, Joseph)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Wacker Neuson Sales Americas, LLC by Mid-South AG Equipment, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3679622) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Distributor Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Exhibit C - Equipment Inventory, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Joseph)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-South AG Equipment Inc v. Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wacker Neuson Sales Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wacker Neuson Sales Americas LLC
Represented By: John L Kirtley
Represented By: Matthew M Wuest
Represented By: Nicholas J Bezier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-South AG Equipment, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph L Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-South AG Equipment Inc
Represented By: Joseph L Olson
Represented By: Marie G Bahoora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?