Mehnert v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: David Todd Mehnert
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00012
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 2/4/2021. (amb)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/21/2021. (amb)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by David Todd Mehnert. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jcl)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiffs brief due 4/18/21; Defendants response due 5/28/21; Plaintiffs reply due 6/12/21. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff via mail) (jad)
January 8, 2021 Transmit #1 Complaint and #4 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/7/21 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (blr)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by David Todd Mehnert. (blr)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by David Todd Mehnert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehnert v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Todd Mehnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?