Schutte v. Ciox Health LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donna Schutte
Defendant: Ciox Health LLC and ProHealth Care Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00204
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Joinder and to Adopt Ciox Health LLC's Opposition to Motion for Remand by ProHealth Care Inc. (Coffey, Patrick)
April 9, 2021 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Daniel A. Manna iso Ciox Health LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Moya Settlement Agmt & Order Approve Settlement Agmt, #2 Exhibit 2-Fotusky v Ebix 18cv832 Mke Cty Compl, #3 Exhibit 3-Fotusky v Ebix 18cv1829 Waukesha Cty Dkt, #4 Exhibit 4-Hills v Essentia Health WD WI Compl, #5 Exhibit 5-Baker-LaRush v Medical Services 2019 11 20 S&C, #6 Exhibit 6-Deming v Ciox DMt Compl, #7 Exhibit 7-Cross v Ciox Health EDNC Compl, #8 Exhibit 8-Rios v Partners in Health WD Tex Compl, #9 Exhibit 9-Browne v Ciox ED Tex Compl)(Manna, Daniel)
April 9, 2021 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Stephen Mallinak iso Ciox Health LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (Manna, Daniel)
April 9, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Ciox Health LLC re #20 MOTION to Remand filed by Plaintiff. (Manna, Daniel)
March 19, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #22 Affidavit ; The Exhibit to this document should have been filed as an attachment. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
March 19, 2021 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Brett Eckstein in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. (Eckstein, Brett)
March 19, 2021 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support filed by Donna Schutte re #20 MOTION to Remand . (Eckstein, Brett)
March 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Eckstein, Brett)
March 15, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M Romashko on behalf of ProHealth Care Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Robert M. Romashko (Romashko, Robert)
March 15, 2021 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE Statement by ProHealth Care Inc. (Coffey, Patrick)
March 15, 2021 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by ProHealth Care Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Coffey, Patrick)
March 15, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Joinder to CIOX HEALTH, LLC's Motion to Dismiss by ProHealth Care Inc. (Coffey, Patrick)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick S Coffey on behalf of ProHealth Care Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick S. Coffey (Coffey, Patrick)
March 15, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ciox Health LLC (Manna, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Daniel A. Manna iso Ciox Health LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-9/1/20 Banuelos Oral Ruling Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2-2/23/21 Meyer Hearing Transcript-Decision, #3 Exhibit 3-Jt Committee on Finance Paper # 367, #4 Exhibit 4-2011 Wis. Act 32 (Selected Pages), #5 Exhibit 5-2009 Wis Act 32 (Selected Pages), #6 Exhibit 6-ASA1 to AB 40 (2011) (Selected Pages), #7 Exhibit 7-Wis Stat sec 146.83 (current), #8 Exhibit 8-Wis Stat sec 146.83 (2009-2010), #9 Exhibit 9-Wis Stat sec 146.83 (2007-2008), #10 Exhibit 10-Governor's Veto Message (6/29/2009), #11 Exhibit 11-2011 AB 40 (Selected Pages))(Manna, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by Ciox Health LLC re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint . (Manna, Daniel)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint by Ciox Health LLC. (Manna, Daniel)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ciox Health LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Manna, Daniel)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Donna Schutte. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Eckstein, Brett)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Donna Schutte. (Eckstein, Brett)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 2/25/21 granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ciox Health LLC answer due 3/15/2021. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ciox Health LLC (Manna, Daniel)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ciox Health LLC. (Manna, Daniel)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Sanderson on behalf of Ciox Health LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph M. Sanderson (Sanderson, Joseph)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay P Lefkowitz, I on behalf of Ciox Health LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jay P. Lefkowitz (Lefkowitz, Jay)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ciox Health LLC (Manna, Daniel)
February 18, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ciox Health LLC. (Manna, Daniel)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ciox Health LLC from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2021CV172 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3738364) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal-S&C w-service rec)(Manna, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schutte v. Ciox Health LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ciox Health LLC
Represented By: Daniel A Manna
Represented By: Jay P Lefkowitz, I
Represented By: Joseph M Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProHealth Care Inc
Represented By: Patrick S Coffey
Represented By: Robert M Romashko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Schutte
Represented By: Edward E Robinson
Represented By: Brett A Eckstein
Represented By: Allan M Foeckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?