Jackson v. Gomm et al
Plaintiff: Littleton Emmett Jackson
Defendant: Captain Radtke, Sireena B Peterson, Zitek, Anthony Matushak, Capt Elsinger, Yang, Perttu, Korpita, Luedeman, Retzlaff, Joshua Gomm, Capt Cushing and Cpt Cushing
Case Number: 2:2021cv00244
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER from Littleton Jackson. (mac)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 VERIFICATION of Littleton Jackson as to signature page submitted with Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 NEF and Information Request form)(lh) Modified text on 4/16/2021 (lh).
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Littleton Emmett Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint (Unsigned))(tlf)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that on or before 4/27/21 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 17.82 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/6/21. (cc: all counsel, warden and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Littleton Emmett Jackson. (lh)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER regarding is trust account statement from plaintiff (jcl)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/22/21 that plaintiff submit to the court by April 6, 2021, a complete, certified copy of his prisoner trust account statement for the six months immediately before he brought this lawsuit. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Littleton Emmett Jackson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jcl)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Littleton Emmett Jackson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (tlf)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Littleton E Jackson re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (mac)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Littleton Emmett Jackson. (mac)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Littleton Emmett Jackson. (mac)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Littleton Emmett Jackson. (mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Gomm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Radtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sireena B Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Matushak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Elsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perttu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korpita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luedeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retzlaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Gomm
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Cushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpt Cushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Littleton Emmett Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?