Gould v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christina Gould
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv00308
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/16/2021. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 6/14/2021;Plaintiff's brief due 7/26/2021;Defendant's response due 9/6/2021;Plaintiff's reply due 9/21/2021. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
April 13, 2021 Transmit #1 Complaint and #7 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/12/2021 GRANTING #6 plaintiff's amended motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 12, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by Christina Gould. The declaration in support should have been filed as a separate entry. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Christina Gould. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration)(Brzezinski, James)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/19/2021. By 4/9/2021 plaintiff to file amended request to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Christina Gould. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brzezinski, James)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Christina Gould. (Brzezinski, James)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Christina Gould. (Brzezinski, James)
March 11, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Christina Gould (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Brzezinski, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Gould
Represented By: James M Brzezinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?