Bridgestone Management LLC v. Companion Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bridgestone Management LLC
Defendant: Companion Life Insurance Company, Spectrum Underwriting Managers, Northwest Illinois Health Alliance, Inc. d/b/a Northern Illinois Health Plan doing business as Northern Illinois Health Plan and Northwest Illinois Health Alliance Inc doing business as Northern Illinois Health Plan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00379
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Bridgestone Management LLC re #19 MOTION to Dismiss by Companion Life Ins and Spectrum Underwriting Managers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, Daniel)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/18/2021. By 6/7/2021 plaintiff to file either amended complaint or response to motion to dismiss. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 17, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support filed by Companion Life Insurance Company, Spectrum Underwriting Managers re #19 MOTION to Dismiss . (Bezier, Nicholas)
May 17, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Companion Life Insurance Company, Spectrum Underwriting Managers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bezier, Nicholas)
May 6, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Northwest Illinois Health Alliance Inc.(Johnson, Alyssa)
April 28, 2021 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE Statement by Companion Life Insurance Company, Spectrum Underwriting Managers. (Bezier, Nicholas)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/28/2021 re #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for defendant Northwest Illinois Health Alliance to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on May 6, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by Bridgestone Management LLC. (Griffin, Daniel)
April 27, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE by Northwest Illinois Health Alliance Inc of Interest and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Johnson, Alyssa)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Northwest Illinois Health Alliance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Alyssa)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa A Johnson on behalf of Northwest Illinois Health Alliance Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Alyssa Johnson (Johnson, Alyssa)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/23/2021 on #10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The court GRANTS the stipulated motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for defendants Companion Life Insurance Company and Spectrum Underwriting Managers to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on May 17, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Companion Life Insurance Company, Spectrum Underwriting Managers. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time)(Bezier, Nicholas)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd G Smith on behalf of Companion Life Insurance Company, Spectrum Underwriting Managers. Attorney(s) appearing: Todd G. Smith (Smith, Todd)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Bezier on behalf of Companion Life Insurance Company, Spectrum Underwriting Managers. Attorney(s) appearing: Nicholas J. Bezier (Bezier, Nicholas)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Bridgestone Management LLC. (Griffin, Daniel)
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bridgestone Management LLC. Northwest Illinois Health Alliance Inc served on 4/7/2021. (Griffin, Daniel)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/16/2021. By 5/7/2021, plaintiff to file jurisdictional memorandum identifying state of citizenship of members of LLC; failure to file by deadline may result in dismissal. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bridgestone Management LLC. Spectrum Underwriting Managers served on 4/5/2021. (Griffin, Daniel)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bridgestone Management LLC. Companion Life Insurance Company served on 4/5/2021. (Griffin, Daniel)
March 31, 2021 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Bridgestone Management LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Griffin, Daniel)
March 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Bridgestone Management LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3775583) (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Companion Life Insurance Co., #2 Summons Summons NIHP, #3 Summons Summons Spectrum Underwriting Managers, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffin, Daniel)
March 25, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgestone Management LLC v. Companion Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companion Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas J Bezier
Represented By: Todd G Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Underwriting Managers
Represented By: Nicholas J Bezier
Represented By: Todd G Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Illinois Health Alliance, Inc. d/b/a Northern Illinois Health Plan doing business as Northern Illinois Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Illinois Health Alliance Inc doing business as Northern Illinois Health Plan
Represented By: Alyssa A Johnson
Represented By: April K Toy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgestone Management LLC
Represented By: Daniel R Griffin
Represented By: Simon B Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?