Estate of Ramon A Echeverria Loza et al v. H&P Trucking LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pioneer Specialty Insurance Company, Estate of Ramon A Echeverria Loza and Roccio A Guerrero
Defendant: Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Risk Retention Group Inc, Jeremy J Phelps and H&P Trucking LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00525
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pioneer Specialty Insurance Company.(Emer, Michael)
May 28, 2021 Filing 25 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Racine Co Circuit Court Docket, #2 Certificate of Service)(Orleans, Jason)
May 25, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #24 Brief in Support of Motion, filed by Jeremy J Phelps, Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Risk Retention Group Inc and H&P Trucking LLC; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. Most documents on the drop-down list do not need further description. If you want to add a description, do not retype the same words into the description box. For example, if you choose Summons from the drop-down list then you may use the description box to the type in the name of the party to whom the summons is directed but you do not need to type the word summons. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (vkb)
May 24, 2021 Filing 24 BRIEF in Support filed by H&P Trucking LLC, Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Risk Retention Group Inc, Jeremy J Phelps re #9 MOTION to Dismiss OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc. & Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint at Law . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Reply Brief)(Orleans, Jason)
May 24, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Knobloch, Eric)
May 24, 2021 Filing 22 PROPOSED Proposed Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Knobloch, Eric)
May 24, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Knobloch, Eric)
May 12, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas L Hermann on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Nicholas Hermann (Hermann, Nicholas)
May 11, 2021 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Orleans, Jason)
May 11, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pioneer Specialty Insurance Company (Emer, Michael)
May 11, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Mullin on behalf of Pioneer Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel K. Mullin (Mullin, Daniel)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE Statement by Pioneer Specialty Insurance Company. (Emer, Michael)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Emer on behalf of Pioneer Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael A. Emer (Emer, Michael)
May 11, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #14 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by plaintiffs; All attachments to documents should include a brief description of the attachment - In this instance you should have stated what the exhibit is: Ex A - Racine County Complaint, Ex B - Order from 19-CV-1224, etc. and not which document they are exhibits to. This document does not need to be refiled. (vkb)
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc. & Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint at Law . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B- Plaintiff Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Knobloch, Eric)
May 6, 2021 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Knobloch, Eric)
May 6, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Knobloch, Eric)
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Knobloch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick Ritter (Knobloch, Eric)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Knobloch on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric M. Knobloch (Knobloch, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss OOIDA Risk Retention Group, Inc. & Count II of Plaintiffs' Complaint at Law by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint at Law, #2 Exhibit B - Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint at Law, #3 Certificate of Service)(Orleans, Jason)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by H&P Trucking LLC, Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Risk Retention Group Inc, Jeremy J Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS Answer and AD)(Orleans, Jason)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad M Sizemore on behalf of H&P Trucking LLC, Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Risk Retention Group Inc, Jeremy J Phelps. Attorney(s) appearing: Chad M Sizemore (Sizemore, Chad)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Defendants of Rule 7.1(a) Disclosure Statements (Orleans, Jason)
April 27, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement filed by Deft Owner Operator Independent Drivers Assoc. (Orleans, Jason)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement filed by Deft H & P Trucking (Orleans, Jason)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement filed by Deft Jeremy J. Phelps (Orleans, Jason)
April 26, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
April 26, 2021 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Notice of Removal filed by defendants; All attachments to documents should include a brief description of the attachment - Ex A - Initial Contract, Ex B - Doe Deposition, Ex C - 2006 Sales Figures, etc. This document does not need to be refiled. (vkb)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Orleans on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jason Orleans (Orleans, Jason)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Risk Retention Group Inc, H&P Trucking LLC, Jeremy J Phelps from Racine County, Case Number: 21CV000872 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3801074) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orleans, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Ramon A Echeverria Loza et al v. H&P Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pioneer Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Michael A Emer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Ramon A Echeverria Loza
Represented By: Patrick K Ritter
Represented By: Nicholas L Hermann
Represented By: Eric M Knobloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roccio A Guerrero
Represented By: Patrick K Ritter
Represented By: Nicholas L Hermann
Represented By: Eric M Knobloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owner Operator Independent Drivers Association Risk Retention Group Inc
Represented By: Jason Orleans
Represented By: Chad M Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy J Phelps
Represented By: Jason Orleans
Represented By: Chad M Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&P Trucking LLC
Represented By: Jason Orleans
Represented By: Chad M Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?