Norwood v. Advocate Aurora Health Care
Plaintiff: Sonya Norwood
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health Care
Case Number: 2:2021cv00535
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Brett Ludwig. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
May 27, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sonya Norwood. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Livingston, Maxwell)
May 19, 2021 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
April 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to Advocate Aurora Health Care. (amb)
April 27, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Advocate Aurora Health Care by Sonya Norwood. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number CWIEDC-3802359) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Livingston, Maxwell) Modified on 4/27/2021 (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwood v. Advocate Aurora Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advocate Aurora Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Norwood
Represented By: Maxwell C Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?