Window Select LLC v. Vertz Marketing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Window Select, LLC and Window Select LLC
Defendant: Vertz Marketing LLC and Tim Vertz
Case Number: 2:2021cv00562
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Timothy Vertz in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration/Dismiss (ECF No. 14) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 3/9/20 Contract, #2 Exhibit B- 1/4/21 Summons + Complaint in Prior Action, #3 Exhibit C- Window Select 1/22/21 Answer in Prior Action, #4 Exhibit D- 3/10/21 Dismissal Stipulation in Prior Action, #5 Exhibit E- 3/30/21 Dismissal Order in Prior Action, #6 Docket Sheet Exhibit F- CCAP Record in Prior Action)(Billings, Ryan)
June 29, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support filed by Tim Vertz, Vertz Marketing LLC re #14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Action Pending Arbitration MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Billings, Ryan)
June 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Action Pending Arbitration, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Tim Vertz, Vertz Marketing LLC. (Billings, Ryan)
June 29, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tim Vertz, Vertz Marketing LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Billings, Ryan)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/14/2021 re #11 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer. The court GRANTS the parties' stipulated motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on June 29, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 29, 2021 by Tim Vertz, Vertz Marketing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer to June 29, 2021)(Billings, Ryan)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/27/2021 re #9 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer. The court GRANTS the parties' stipulated motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on June 15, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Window Select LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Time to Answer)(Krajewski, Brandon)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Tim Vertz, Vertz Marketing LLC. (Billings, Ryan)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M Billings on behalf of Tim Vertz, Vertz Marketing LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan M. Billings (Billings, Ryan)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Window Select LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Zenk, Lauren)
May 4, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been added - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. Punctuation and addresses removed from party names - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. Most documents on the drop-down list do not need further description. If you want to add a description, do not retype the same words into the description box. For example, if you choose Summons from the drop-down list then you may use the description box to the type in the name of the party to whom the summons is directed but you do not need to type the word summons. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (amb)
May 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (amb)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P Poehlmann on behalf of Window Select, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph Poehlmann (Poehlmann, Joseph)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren N Zenk on behalf of Window Select, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Lauren N. Zenk (Zenk, Lauren)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon M Krajewski on behalf of Window Select, LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Brandon Krajewski (Krajewski, Brandon)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Window Select, LLC. (Krajewski, Brandon)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Window Select, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3807981) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet )(Krajewski, Brandon) Modified on 5/4/2021 (amb).
May 3, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Window Select LLC v. Vertz Marketing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Window Select, LLC
Represented By: Joseph P Poehlmann
Represented By: Brandon M Krajewski
Represented By: Lauren N Zenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Window Select LLC
Represented By: Joseph P Poehlmann
Represented By: Brandon M Krajewski
Represented By: Lauren N Zenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertz Marketing LLC
Represented By: Ryan M Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Vertz
Represented By: Ryan M Billings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?