Claypool v. Evers et al
Plaintiff: Bryant K Claypool
Defendant: Angela Thompson, Austin J Korman, Kira Labby, Kevin A Carr, John and Jane Does, Tony Evers, Christine Burnett, Shane Garland, Janelle R Garcia, Steven Bost and Susan Peters
Case Number: 2:2021cv00571
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/10/21. Plaintiff's motion to stay this case pending his recruitment of counsel and/or his release from prison #7 is GRANTED. The previous deadline for amending his complaint is VACATED and all deadlines in this case are hereby STAYED. The court will reopen this case on June 1, 2022 at the latest, regardless of whether Plaintiff is represented by a lawyer at that time. Plaintiff is to provide the court with an updated mailing address when he is released and contact the court in the event he is able to hire a lawyer. Failure to provide an updated address may result in dismissal of this case for lack of diligent prosecution. See Civ. L. R. 41(c). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall close this case administratively. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(jad)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/4/21 that the plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee #2 is GRANTED. The complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Any putative state-law claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint that complies with the instructions in this order on or before July 6, 2021. (cc: all counsel, warden and mailed to pro se party w/form and guide)(jad)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Case until June 2022 by Bryant K Claypool. (jcl)
May 25, 2021 FILING FEE Received: $350.00, receipt number 086427. (bx)
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Bryant K Claypool. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
May 13, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (Mailed NEF to plaintiff via USPS) (asc)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph that on or before 6/7/2021 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 181.33 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party, warden)(asc)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Bryant Claypool re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (mac)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Bryant K Claypool. (mac)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Bryant K Claypool. (mac)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Bryant K Claypool. (mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Claypool v. Evers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin J Korman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kira Labby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin A Carr
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janelle R Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Bost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant K Claypool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?