Arellano et al v. T and B Tube Co Inc et al
Plaintiff: Marianne Solorio and Roque Arellano
Defendant: Tube Fabrication & Color LLC and T and B Tube Co Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00581
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE: At the 7/29/21 status conference, the Court will expect counsel familiar with the case to appear and be ready to discuss the matters identified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(c)(2) and Civil L. R. 16(a)(1). Counsel should also be prepared to discuss a discovery plan, which the Court expects the parties to have discussed and filed timely under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). (cc: all counsel)(kwb)
June 28, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/29/21 at 10:30 AM by Telephone before Judge Brett H. Ludwig. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-866-434-5269, and enter access code 1737450# before the scheduled hearing time. (cc: all counsel) (kwb)
May 26, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Brett Ludwig. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/26/21. Attorney Granitz's motion to withdraw attorneys Richard R. Skiles and Dane A. Mize, ECF No. #60 , is APPROVED. Now, for the reasons given in the motion, attorneys Skiles and Mize are withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant T and B Tube Co., Inc. (cc: all counsel) (ntj)
May 26, 2021 Filing 61 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tube Fabrication & Color LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Groenewold, Joel)
May 26, 2021 Filing 60 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard R. Skiles and Dane A. Mize by T and B Tube Co Inc. (Granitz, Matthew)
May 26, 2021 Filing 59 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Munvez, Cole)
May 26, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel D Groenewold on behalf of Tube Fabrication & Color LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Joel D. Groenewold (Groenewold, Joel)
May 25, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry A Trapp on behalf of T and B Tube Co Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Kerry A. Trapp (Trapp, Kerry)
May 18, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L Granitz on behalf of T and B Tube Co Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew L. Granitz (Granitz, Matthew)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/18/2021. As no response was filed to plaintiffs' motion to correct/amend, ECF No. #55 , by May 14, 2021, as required by the previous text only order, plaintiffs' motion to correct/amend is GRANTED. Accordingly, Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC, is included as a defendant to this action. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
May 7, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct Court Docket to Include Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC as Party Defendant in Case # 21-cv-00581 by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Norem, Christopher)
May 7, 2021 Filing 54 DISCLOSURE Statement by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Norem, Christopher)
May 7, 2021 Filing 53 DISCLOSURE Statement by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Munvez, Cole)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 5/7/2021. Any response to plaintiffs' motion to correct/amend, ECF No. #55 , should be filed on or before May 14, 2021. Absent any objection, the motion will be granted. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
May 6, 2021 Filing 52 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00342. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 6, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #46 Motion to Transfer. Case is transferred to the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Case sent by electronic transfer to Eastern Wisconsin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/5/21. (mlc) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 25 USC 1406 filed by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
April 30, 2021 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion re #46 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 25 USC 1406 filed by Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. (Magrames, James) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
April 29, 2021 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #46 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 25 USC 1406 filed by T and B Tube Co, Inc.. (Mize, Dane) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 47 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/22/2021, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pltfs appeared by attys Cole Munvez, Christopher Norem. Dft appeared by atty Dane Mize. Response to DE 46 Plaintiffs' Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 25 U.S.C. 1406 due by 4/30/2021; reply to be filed by 5/7/2021. cc: Atty Magrames (tc) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 46 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 25 USC 1406 by Plaintiffs Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION AND ORDER: The MOTION #16 is GRANTED. The court DISMISSES Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC from this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 04/21/2021. (edb) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER: The Court sets this matter for a Telephonic Status Conference on 4/22/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1274 and enter access code 4620540# when prompted to join the conference. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/9/2021. Text entry only. (tc) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 43 AGREED NOTICE OF CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Magistrate Judge John E Martin and Judge Theresa L Springmann on longer assigned. (kjp) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE: Due to the backlog of criminal cases caused by the pandemic, it is unlikely that the assigned district judge will schedule a trial date for this Hammond civil case until 2022 at the earliest. One or more parties previously declined to consent to the magistrate judge who was assigned this case for scheduling purposes before the close of discovery. The parties now have a second opportunity to consent to a Hammond magistrate judge for trial purposes. Rather than the previous random assignment of a magistrate judge, the parties can select which magistrate judge (Magistrate Judges John Martin, Joshua Kolar or Andrew Rodovich) they prefer to hear this case. All parties must agree on which magistrate judge will hear the case and file an Agreed Notice. Only one Agreed Notice should be filed for all parties in this case. Absent an agreement, the case will remain on the docket of the district judge. (ksc) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. (Magrames, James) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Ken Tritt, #2 Exhibit Deposition of Ken Tritt, #3 Exhibit Responses to Jurisdictional Discovery by Tube Fabrication, #4 Exhibit Responses to Jurisdictional Discovery by T and B Tube)(Munvez, Cole) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the deadline for the Plaintiffs to file a response to the pending Motion to Dismiss #16 is 08/30/2019 and the deadline for Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC to file a reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss is 09/13/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 08/13/2019. (jat) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 38 SUPPLEMENT Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement as to Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC filed by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions Records, #2 Exhibit B - Tube Fabrication & Color LLC's Responses to Jurisdictional Discovery No. 3, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Investigator)(Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR CHIEF JUDGE THERESA L SPRINGMANN. In light of the July 8, 2019 deadline for Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color LLC to respond to interrogatories and requests for production regarding jurisdictional discovery, the Court grants Plaintiff's request for an extension of time and ORDERS that the deadline for Plaintiffs to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement is extended to 8/9/2019. (rs) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio to #35 Order,, Set Deadlines, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ken Tritt, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement as to Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC., #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Jurisdictional Interrogatories & Request to Produce to Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC., #4 Exhibit D - Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. Corporate Records Search)(Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION AND ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement on or before 7/2/2019 identifying the citizenship of each of the members of Tube Fabrication & Color LLC as of the date the Complaint was filed. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/18/19. (ksc) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Response to interrogatories and requests for production to be provided by 7/8/2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/10/2019. No pdf attached.(cp) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. (Magrames, James) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Responses to interrogatories and requests for production to be provided by Defendant by June 8, 2019. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/15/2019. No pdf attached. (cp) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. (Magrames, James) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: The Clerk is hereby directed to reassign this case from Judge Joseph S. Van Bokkelen to Chief Judge Theresa L. Springmann as the presider for all further proceedings. This order does not change the assignment of the Magistrate Judge or any previously scheduled deadlines, hearings or trial dates. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2019. (jss) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER striking 28 CERTIFICATE of Service of Plaintiff's Jurisdictional Interrogatories and Request to Produce. Northern District of Indiana Local Rule 26-2 prohibits the routine filing of service-of-discovery notices, with certain exceptions that do not appear applicable in this instance. N.D. Ind. L.R. 26-2(a)(1)(H). Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/15/2019. (smb) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) Discovery Plan Setting and for Leave to Issue Jurisdictional Discovery to Address Defendant, Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC's, Pending 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss #21 and ORDERS Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC to cooperate with limited discovery requests from plaintiffs addressing jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/22/19. (ksp) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Stay Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) Discovery Plan Setting and for Leave to Issue Jurisdictional Discovery to Address Defendant, Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC.'s Pending 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss filed by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Stay Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) Discovery Plan Setting and for Leave to Issue Jurisdictional Discovery to Address Defendant, Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC.'s Pending 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss filed by Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. (Magrames, James) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 Scheduled for RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 12/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Norem. Dfts appeared by attys Dane Mize, Jane Callies subst for James Magrames. No proposed discovery plan has been filed because Pla(s) have moved to stay general discovery and conduct jurisdictional discovery. Without objection, the Court extends the deadline for Dft Tube Fabrication and Color LLC to respond to #21 MOTION to Stay Discovery to 1/11/2019. Pla(s)' Reply to be filed by 1/31/2019. In the meantime, discovery is STAYED as between Pla(s) and Dft T and B Tube Co Inc. by agreement. Rule 16b Prelim PTC to be reset where necessary after jurisdictional issue is resolved. (#FTR.) (smb) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT al Jurisdictional Statement to Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. filed by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Ken Tritt, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Brian Dunscomb)(Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio to Affirmative Defenses of Defendant T and B Tube Company, Inc.. (Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) Discovery Plan Setting and for Leave to Issue Jurisdictional Discovery to Address Defendant, Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC.'s Pending 12(b)(2) Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TFC Website Printout)(Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an amendment to their jurisdictional statement to correct the deficiency as outlined in this Order by 12/18/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 12/4/18. (ksp) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by T and B Tube Co, Inc.. (Mize, Dane) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 T and B Tube Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Trial Request by T and B Tube Co, Inc..(Mize, Dane) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 BRIEF in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. (Magrames, James) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ken Tritt)(Magrames, James) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dane A Mize on behalf of T and B Tube Co, Inc. (Mize, Dane) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2018 10:00 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 12/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/2/2018. (smb) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/2/2018. (smb) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC answer due 12/3/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/17/2018. No pdf attached.(cp) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. (Magrames, James) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James G Magrames on behalf of Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC (Magrames, James) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. T and B Tube Co, Inc. answer due 12/3/2018. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/16/2018.No pdf attached. (cp) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant T and B Tube Co, Inc.. (Skiles, Richard) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R Skiles on behalf of T and B Tube Co, Inc. (Skiles, Richard) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roque Arellano. Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roque Arellano. T and B Tube Co, Inc. served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Cole H Munvez on behalf of Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio (Munvez, Cole) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to T and B Tube Co, Inc., Tube Fabrication & Color, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
September 14, 2018 Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (New Case) (sct) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3678579.), filed by Roque Arellano, Marianne Solorio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Summons)(Norem, Christopher) [Transferred from innd on 5/6/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arellano et al v. T and B Tube Co Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Solorio
Represented By: Christopher Norem
Represented By: Cole H Munvez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roque Arellano
Represented By: Christopher Norem
Represented By: Cole H Munvez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tube Fabrication & Color LLC
Represented By: James G Magrames
Represented By: Joel D Groenewold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T and B Tube Co Inc
Represented By: Richard R Skiles
Represented By: Dane A Mize
Represented By: Kerry A Trapp
Represented By: Matthew L Granitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?