Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Racine Zoological Society
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company and Firemans Fund Insurance Company
Defendant: Racine Zoological Society
3Rd Party Defendant: China Lantern International LLC doing business as Zigong Lantern Group, China Lantern International LLC and Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group Co Ltd
Case Number: 2:2021cv00642
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 68 LETTER from Thomas Hunker and Keisha Hall re: status of Motion to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint. (amb)
March 15, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE by China Lantern International LLC, Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group Co Ltd China Lantern NC's Notice of Supplemental Response to Society's RFP (Hall, Keisha)
March 15, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE by China Lantern International LLC, Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group Co Ltd 2022-03-15 Second Amended Third Cross Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum for 4-1-2022 of Beth Heidorn (Hall, Keisha)
March 3, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE by China Lantern International LLC 2022-03-03 Amended Third Cross Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum for 4-1-2022 of Beth Heidorn (Hall, Keisha)
February 4, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE by China Lantern International LLC, Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group Co Ltd (Hall, Keisha)
January 27, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Keisha K Hall on behalf of China Lantern International LLC, Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group Co Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Keisha K. Hall (Hall, Keisha)
January 26, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE by China Lantern International LLC (Hunker, Thomas)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/26/2022. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/24/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2022. Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 10/14/2022. Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 12/13/2022. Third-Party Defendants' Expert Witness List due by 2/10/2023. Discovery due by 6/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2023, Civil LR 56 response and reply deadlines apply; parties to file joint status report by 4/14/2023 if they choose not to file dispositive motion. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
January 25, 2022 Filing 60 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Racine Zoological Society. (Rider, Andrew)
January 6, 2022 Filing 59 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by China Lantern International LLC re #49 MOTION to Dismiss and for failure to join a party MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Party . (Hunker, Thomas)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/5/2022 re #57 Motion for Extension of Time filed by China Lantern International, LLC. The court GRANTS the third-party defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for third-party defendant China Lantern International to file a reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss the third-party complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 6, 2022. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
January 4, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Amended Third-Party Complaint by China Lantern International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Hunker, Thomas)
January 4, 2022 Filing 56 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Firemans Fund Insurance Company re #23 MOTION to Strike Defendant's First Affirmative Defense . (Carroll, Philip)
December 21, 2021 Filing 55 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Racine Zoological Society re #49 MOTION to Dismiss and for failure to join a party MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Party . This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Rider, Andrew)
December 21, 2021 Filing 54 DECLARATION of Andrew R. Rider in Support of Response Brief to Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exh A - Emails May 2018, #2 Exh B - Business cards, #3 Exh C - Email February 2019, #4 Exh D - Text messages between parties, #5 Exh E - Text messages regarding TV appearance)(Rider, Andrew)
December 21, 2021 Filing 53 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Racine Zoological Society re #49 MOTION to Dismiss and for failure to join a party MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss Party . (Rider, Andrew)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/14/2021 re #51 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Reply Brief. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file a reply brief in support of its motion to strike defendant's first affirmative defense is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 7, 2022. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 51 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to File Reply Brief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carroll, Philip)
December 8, 2021 Filing 50 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Racine Zoological Society as to Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group Co Ltd. (Rider, Andrew)
November 30, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss and for failure to join a party, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss Party by China Lantern International LLC. This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Hunker, Thomas)
November 30, 2021 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Andrew R. Rider (Attachments: #1 Zigong Lantern Company's Web Page)(Rider, Andrew)
November 30, 2021 Filing 47 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Racine Zoological Society re #23 MOTION to Strike Defendant's First Affirmative Defense of Plaintiff, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, as subrogee of City of Racine. (Rider, Andrew)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/29/2021 re #44 #45 Agreed Motions for Extension of Time. The court GRANTS the third-party defendant's motions for extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the third-party defendant to respond to the third-party plaintiff's discovery is EXTENDED until the end of the day on December 6, 2021. The court ORDERS that the time for the third-party defendant to respond to the third-party plaintiff's amended complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 30, 2021; the court is not inclined to grant any further extension of this deadline absent a showing of good cause. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 29, 2021 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Third Party Amended Complaint by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
November 29, 2021 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
November 28, 2021 Filing 43 REPLY filed by China Lantern International LLC re #32 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #30 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint. (Hunker, Thomas)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/24/2021 re #40 #41 Agreed Motions for Extension of Time. The court GRANTS the third-party defendant's motions for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the third-party defendant to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 24, 2021; the time for the third-party defendant to file its response to the third-party plaintiff's amended complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 24, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 23, 2021 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Third Party Amended Complaint by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
November 23, 2021 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion to Dismiss by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/16/2021 re #38 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. The court GRANTS the motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the third-party defendant to respond to the third-party plaintiff's amended complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 22, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 12, 2021 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Third Party Amended Complaint by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/8/2021 re #35 #36 Agreed Motions for Extension of Time. The court GRANTS the parties' motions for extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the third-party defendant to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 15, 2021. The court further ORDERS that the time for the third-party defendant to file its responses to the third-party plaintiff's discovery is EXTENDED until the end of the day on November 25, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 5, 2021 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
November 5, 2021 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion to Dismiss by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/3/2021 re #27 Stipulation to Allow Third Party Plaintiff to Amend Third Party Complaint and Order to Extend Deadline to File Response Briefs. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation. The court ORDERS that the defendant/third-party plaintiff may amend its third-party complaint to name and assert claims against Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group Co., Ltd. The court ORDERS that despite the amendment of the third-party complaint, the plaintiff may pursue its motion to strike defendant's first affirmative defense regardless of whether service on Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group is successful. The court ORDERS that the defendant/third-party plaintiff shall file an affidavit of service by the end of the day on November 31, 2021, indicating whether or not the amended third party complaint was served on Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group. The court ORDERS that the defendant/third-party plaintiff shall file a response brief to the plaintiff's motion to strike by the end of the day on November 31, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 29, 2021 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Andrew R. Rider (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Rider, Andrew)
October 29, 2021 Filing 32 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Racine Zoological Society re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for failure to join a party . This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Rider, Andrew)
October 29, 2021 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Andrew R. Rider (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement)(Rider, Andrew)
October 29, 2021 Filing 30 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Racine Zoological Society re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for failure to join a party . (Rider, Andrew)
October 29, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Restrict Document by Racine Zoological Society. (Rider, Andrew)
October 29, 2021 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against China Lantern International LLC filed by Racine Zoological Society.(Rider, Andrew)
October 29, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Allow Third Party Plaintiff to Amend Third Party Complaint by Racine Zoological Society. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order to extend deadline to file response briefs)(Rider, Andrew)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/26/2021 re #25 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response Briefs. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for defendant Racine Zoological Society to file its response brief to the plaintiff's motion to strike and its response brief to the third-party defendant's motion to dismiss is EXTENDED until the end of the day on October 29, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 25, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to File Response Briefs by Racine Zoological Society. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Deadline to File Response Briefs)(Rider, Andrew)
October 5, 2021 Filing 24 BRIEF in Support filed by Firemans Fund Insurance Company re #23 MOTION to Strike Defendant's First Affirmative Defense . (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Society's Responses to Plaintiff's First Requests for Admission)(Carroll, Philip)
October 5, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike Defendant's First Affirmative Defense by Firemans Fund Insurance Company. (Carroll, Philip)
October 4, 2021 Filing 22 DISCLOSURE Statement by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
October 4, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for failure to join a party by China Lantern International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hunker, Thomas)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/4/2021 re #19 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. The court GRANTS the parties' agreed motion. The court ORDERS that the time for the third-party defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the defendant/third-party plaintiff's complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on October 4, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 1, 2021 Filing 19 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by China Lantern International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunker, Thomas)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/15/2021 re #14 Joint Motion to Approve Stipulations and #15 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Third-Party Complaint. The court GRANTS the joint motion to approve stipulations to amend the case caption and for extension of deadline. Dkt. No. 14. The court ORDERS the Clerk of Court to amend the caption of this case to reflect that the correct third-party defendant is "China Lantern International LLC, a now dissolved North Carolina LLC which was organized in North Carolina at 9729 Corktree Ct., Wake Forest, NC 27587." The court APPROVES the Stipulation to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Third-Party Complaint. Dkt. No. 15. The court ORDERS that the third-party defendant shall file an answer or other responsive pleading the the plaintiff's third-party complaint by the end of the day on September 26, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/15/2021 GRANTING #12 joint motion for protective order. Note: parties' proposed order modified to comport with E.D. Wis. template order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Amend Caption by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Third-Party Complaint by China Lantern International LLC. (Hunker, Thomas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption and Accept Stipulations by China Lantern International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order Amending Caption, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer Third-Party Complaint)(Hunker, Thomas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 13 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Third-Party Complaint on August 27, 2021 by Thomas Hunker (Hunker, Thomas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by China Lantern International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Hunker, Thomas)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Hunker on behalf of China Lantern International LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Thomas Hunker (Hunker, Thomas)
June 29, 2021 Summons Issued as to Third-Party Defendant China Lantern International LLC. (lz)
June 29, 2021 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (lz)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Racine Zoological Society against (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Answer, #3 Summons)(Rider, Andrew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Racine Zoological Society. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rider, Andrew)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Racine Zoological Society. (Rider, Andrew)
June 16, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (mlm)
June 16, 2021 NOTICE to Defendant - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days (mlm)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Racine Zoological Society.(Rhoades, Travis)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R Rider on behalf of Racine Zoological Society. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew R. Rider (Rider, Andrew)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis J Rhoades on behalf of Racine Zoological Society. Attorney(s) appearing: Travis J. Rhoades (Rhoades, Travis)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Carroll, Philip)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Racine Zoological Society served on 6/1/2021. (Carroll, Philip)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Carroll, Philip)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Racine Zoological Society by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3825354) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Rental Request Form, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carroll, Philip)
May 24, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
May 24, 2021 Summons Issued as to Racine Zoological Society. (lz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Racine Zoological Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip T Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firemans Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip T Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Racine Zoological Society
Represented By: Andrew R Rider
Represented By: Travis J Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: China Lantern International LLC doing business as Zigong Lantern Group
Represented By: Thomas L Hunker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: China Lantern International LLC
Represented By: Thomas L Hunker
Represented By: Keisha K Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Zigong Lantern Culture Industry Group Co Ltd
Represented By: Keisha K Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?