Balsewicz v. Moungey et al
Plaintiff: John H Balsewicz
Defendant: Sean Bryan, Mykala Wade, Capt Rymarkiewitz, Matthew Burns, Jamie Moungey, Jeremy L Westra, Yana Puisch, Jonathan S Pawlyk, Nicholas, Lisa Stoffle, Brian Foster, Anthony P Meli, Steven Wiemenga, Mitchell Billie, Sanchez and Leigha Weber
Case Number: 2:2021cv00746
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl) (Main Document 22 replaced on 6/17/2021) (jcl).
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:20-cv-00596. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Plaintiff's motions to transfer these cases, dkt. #15 in case no. 20-cv-596-wmc and dkt. #12 in case no. 20-cv-1096-wmc, are GRANTED. Case nos. 20-cv-596-wmc and 20-cv-1096-wmc are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 6/17/2021. (kmd),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 17, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
June 11, 2021 Filing 19 Letter from Clerk's Office regarding Letter requesting status update, notice of change of address, request for three complaint forms. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 18 Letter requesting status update, notice of change of address, request for three complaint forms by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (Attachments: #1 Account statement, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 17 Letter from Clerk's Office regarding Letter Requesting Status Update. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 16 Letter Requesting Status Update by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 15 Motion for a Change of Venue by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Change of Address by Plaintiffs John H. Balsewicz (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from plaintiff regarding spelling of defendant Matthew Burns' name. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's office response to plaintiff's letter received on 9/30/20. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 Letter requesting status update by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
July 8, 2020 Partial Filing fee received: $ 26.13, receipt number 34690037173. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and to Amend the #1 Complaint later without permission by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 26.13 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 06/29/20. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration of William J. Hurt filed by John Balsewicz (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of Justin Bey filed by John Balsewicz (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 Declaration of Dean Martin filed by John Balsewicz (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Declaration of Benjamin Robinson filed by John Balsewicz (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John H. Balsewicz. (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by John H. Balsewicz. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certification as to Three or More Dismissals, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (aom),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 6/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balsewicz v. Moungey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mykala Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Rymarkiewitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Moungey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy L Westra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yana Puisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan S Pawlyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Stoffle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony P Meli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wiemenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Billie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigha Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H Balsewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?