Fares v. H B & H LLC et al
Plaintiff: Noer Fares
Defendant: H, B & H, LLC, Gerald Hay, H B & H LLC doing business as On The Border Gentlemen's Club and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv00753
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 10:30 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel)(asc)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by H B & H LLC, Gerald Hay. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Steinle, W)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by H B & H LLC, Gerald Hay. (Steinle, W)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEF in Support filed by H B & H LLC, Gerald Hay re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Collective Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint 2:21-CV-683)(Steinle, W)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Collective Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(6) by H B & H LLC, Gerald Hay. (Steinle, W)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by W Timothy Steinle on behalf of H B & H LLC, Gerald Hay. Attorney(s) appearing: W. Timothy Steinle (Steinle, W)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noer Fares. H B & H LLC served on 7/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service re H, B & H, LLC)(Kristensen, John)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noer Fares. Gerald Hay served on 7/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service re Gerald Hay)(Kristensen, John)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Noer Fares of Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Janei Rice Signed Consent)(Kristensen, John)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Noer Fares. (Kristensen, John)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Noer Fares. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kristensen, John)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay A Urban on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Jay A. Urban (Urban, Jay)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (rcm)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to H B & H LLC, Gerald Hay. (rcm)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jarrett L Ellzey on behalf of Noer Fares. Attorney(s) appearing: Jarrett L. Ellzey (Ellzey, Jarrett)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Collective) For Damages and Demand for Jury Trial with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Noer Fares. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3847546) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Hay, #3 Summons On The Border, #4 Consent to Join - Fares)(Kristensen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fares v. H B & H LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noer Fares
Represented By: John P Kristensen
Represented By: Jarrett L Ellzey
Represented By: Jay A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H, B & H, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Hay
Represented By: W Timothy Steinle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H B & H LLC doing business as On The Border Gentlemen's Club
Represented By: W Timothy Steinle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?