Estevez v. Grode et al
Plaintiff: Michael J Estevez
Defendant: David L Weber, Nicholas P Grode, Lt Tammy Sternard and Scott Lohman
Case Number: 2:2021cv00756
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Brett Ludwig
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 14 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 8/12/21; the action is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim and the plaintiff shall recover nothing on the complaint (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se party)(vkb)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCREENING ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 8/12/21 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim; the clerk shall document that this inmate has incurred a strike; FURTHER ORDERING that the Clerk enter judgment accordingly (cc: all counsel, emailed to DLSFedOrdersEastCL@doj.state.wi.us. and mailed to pro se party)(vkb)
August 9, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER from plaintiff submitting original amended complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachment - copy of letter from clerk)(vkb)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER from the Clerk to Michael Estevez regarding #10 Illegible Documents. (mac)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 PROPOSED Amended Complaint and Letter filed by Michael J Estevez (ILLEGIBLE DOCUMENTS). (mac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2021: #1 Legible Scan of Amended Complaint) (vkb).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 7/21/2021 granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Further ordered that the complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. The institution shall collect from plaintiff the balance of the filing fee of $310 in accordance with 18 USC 1915(b)(2). (cc: all counsel and mailed to Warden and pro se party with amended complaint form and Prisoner Guide)(kmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2021: #1 Amended complaint form, #2 Prisoner Guide) (kmm).
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER from plaintiff re: IPFF. His mother, Annette Estevez, will mail a check for the initial partial filing fee. (kmm)
July 15, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $40, receipt number MK4689-086894. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Brett Ludwig on 6/25/21 that within 30 days from the date of this order plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $37.81 as an initial partial filing fee in this action (cc: all counsel and mailed to warden and pro se party)(vkb)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michael J Estevez. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael J Estevez. (lh)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Michael J Estevez. (lh)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the Clerk to Michael J Estevez regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER from the Clerk to Michael J Estevez requesting that he submit the consent/refusal form for Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries within 21 days. Plaintiff must also submit either the filing fee or his request to proceed without prepayment and his six-month certified trust account statement. (tlf)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Michael J Estevez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits (with bookmarks))(tlf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estevez v. Grode et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas P Grode
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Tammy Sternard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Estevez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?