Innovaport LLC v. IKEA North America Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Innovaport LLC
Defendant: IKEA North America Services LLC and IKEA Trading Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00789
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge Brett H Ludwig on 7/26/2021 granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 9/6/2021. (cc: all counsel)(kmm)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by IKEA North America Services LLC, IKEA Trading Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Innovaport LLC. (Lin, Marriam)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Innovaport LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lin, Marriam)
July 20, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
July 20, 2021 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. (rcm)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovaport LLC. IKEA North America Services LLC served on 7/15/2021. (Lin, Marriam)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (rcm)
June 28, 2021 Summons Issued as to IKEA North America Services LLC, IKEA Trading Services Inc. (rcm)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Innovaport LLC by Innovaport LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3854244) (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Complaint Exhibit B, #3 Complaint Exhibit C, #4 Complaint Exhibit D, #5 Summons Civil Summons - IKEA North America Services, #6 Summons Civil Summons - IKEA Trading Services, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Griggs, Michael)
June 25, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovaport LLC v. IKEA North America Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IKEA North America Services LLC
Represented By: David B Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IKEA Trading Services Inc
Represented By: David B Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovaport LLC
Represented By: Michael T Griggs
Represented By: Marriam Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?