Chapman et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Jeremy Chapman, Kemoy Fong and Paul Pilof
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00794
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ford Motor Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rajkumar, Roshan)
August 17, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (kah)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jeremy Chapman, Paul Pilof. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chester, Anthony)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Rajkumar, Roshan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Roshan N Rajkumar on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Roshan N. Rajkumar (Rajkumar, Roshan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Rajkumar, Roshan)
August 16, 2021 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFFS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (kah)
August 10, 2021 DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR. CASE NOT TERMINATED. Case Terminated pursuant to #3 Notice. (amb) Modified on 8/11/2021 (amb).
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kemoy Fong. (Chester, Anthony)
July 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (amb)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Jeremy Chapman, Kemoy Fong, Paul Pilof (Chester, Anthony)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Jeremy Chapman, Paul Pilof, Kemoy Fong. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3854427)(Chester, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).
June 25, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Chapman
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemoy Fong
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Pilof
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Aleena K Wilson
Represented By: Roshan N Rajkumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?