The Bag Tavern LLC et al v. Society Insurance
Plaintiff: The Bag Tavern, LLC, Crosstown Pub and Grill Inc., Tolon LLC, JL Holdings Inc., One Louder, LLC, JPM Hospitality Group, LLC, SAC Corp., The Bag Tavern LLC, Crosstown Pub and Grill Inc, JL Holdings Inc, One Louder LLC and SAC Corp
Defendant: Society Insurance
Case Number: 2:2021cv00916
Filed: August 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred to Northern District of Illinois; Opened as case 1:21-cv-04553 on filed 08/26/2021 (bx)
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 Certified Order to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois on 08/26/2021. (cc: all counsel)(bx)
August 26, 2021 Case Electronically Transmitted to the Northern District of Illinois on 08/26/2021. (bx)
August 25, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to ALL PARTIES COUNSEL requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 10 days; the form is available #here. (bx)
August 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J Levitt on behalf of Crosstown Pub and Grill Inc, JL Holdings Inc, JPM Hospitality Group, LLC, One Louder LLC, SAC Corp, The Bag Tavern LLC, Tolon LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Adam J. Levitt (Levitt, Adam)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by Society Insurance. (Vogt, Heidi)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by Society Insurance re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Comply with Civil L.R. 8 . (Vogt, Heidi)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to Comply with Civil L.R. 8 by Society Insurance. (Vogt, Heidi)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E Avallone on behalf of Society Insurance. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher E. Avallone (Avallone, Christopher)
August 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet E Cain on behalf of Society Insurance. Attorney(s) appearing: Janet Cain (Cain, Janet)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth J Kushner on behalf of Society Insurance. Attorney(s) appearing: Beth J. Kushner (Kushner, Beth)
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi L Vogt on behalf of Society Insurance. Attorney(s) appearing: Heidi L. Vogt (Vogt, Heidi)
August 12, 2021 Docket Annotation: Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action MDL 2964 Documents received. (bx)
August 5, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)
August 5, 2021 Summons Issued as to Society Insurance. (bx)
August 5, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified (Do not add addresses or punctuation)- please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (bx)
August 4, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Burns, Timothy)
August 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Society Insurance by JPM Hospitality Group, LLC, Tolon LLC, SAC Corp., Crosstown Pub and Grill Inc., JL Holdings Inc., The Bag Tavern, LLC, One Louder, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3885905) (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: 3.16.2020 Memorandum, #2 Ex. B: March 23 Letter, #3 Ex. C: 3.27.2020 Memorandum, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burns, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bag Tavern LLC et al v. Society Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bag Tavern, LLC
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crosstown Pub and Grill Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tolon LLC
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JL Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Louder, LLC
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPM Hospitality Group, LLC
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAC Corp.
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bag Tavern LLC
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crosstown Pub and Grill Inc
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JL Holdings Inc
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Louder LLC
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAC Corp
Represented By: Adam J Levitt
Represented By: Timothy W Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance
Represented By: Beth J Kushner
Represented By: Christopher E Avallone
Represented By: Heidi L Vogt
Represented By: Janet E Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?