Daniels v. Ryan Companies US Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dakota Daniels, Informal Admistrator of the Estate of Zachary Dassow, Deceased, and Next Friend for Presley Daniels and Dakota Daniels
Defendant: Ryan Companies US, Inc., Amazon.com Services, LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Commerce 94 Project, LLC, Ryan Companies US Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com Services Inc and Commerce 94 Project LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00921
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 9/27/2021. Defendant Ryan Companies US Inc.'s unopposed motion to remand to state court #8 is GRANTED. This case is hereby remanded to the Circuit Court for Milwaukee County for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel) (kah)
September 27, 2021 Certified Copy of Text Only Order and Docket mailed to the Milwaukee County Circuit Court on 9/27/2021. (kah)
September 24, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ryan Companies US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Hall, Samuel)
September 17, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to all parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
September 16, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Loringer on behalf of Amazon.com Services Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: John P. Loringer (Loringer, John)
September 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin F Geary on behalf of Amazon.com Services Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Kevin F. Geary (Geary, Kevin)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries. The parties' stipulation, ECF No. #3 , is APPROVED. Defendants may have until September 20, 2021, to respond to the plaintiff's complaint. (cc: all counsel)(jh)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED Proposed Order filed by Ryan Companies US Inc. (Flood, Zachary)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by Ryan Companies US Inc. (Flood, Zachary)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER to Mackenzie J. Mahony, Sean P. Murray and Chester L. Cameron, Jr regarding Admission and ECF registration (sent via USPS) (jcl)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ryan Companies US, Inc. from Milwaukee County, Case Number: 21CV4009 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3887571) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-summons and complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Samuel)
August 6, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Ryan Companies US Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Daniels, Informal Admistrator of the Estate of Zachary Dassow, Deceased, and Next Friend for Presley Daniels
Represented By: Chester L Cameron
Represented By: Mackenzie J Mahony
Represented By: Sean P Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota Daniels
Represented By: Chester L Cameron
Represented By: Mackenzie J Mahony
Represented By: Sean P Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Companies US, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce 94 Project, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Companies US Inc
Represented By: Zachary J Flood
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: John P Loringer
Represented By: Kevin F Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services Inc
Represented By: John P Loringer
Represented By: Kevin F Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce 94 Project LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?