Blue v. Eplett et al
Plaintiff: Randall Blue
Defendant: Cheryl Eplett, Emil Toney, Jeffrey T Lawrence, Jeffrey Freund, J Harris-Forbes and Cindy Ostrowski
Case Number: 2:2021cv00946
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $49.00, receipt number MK4689-087453. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/23/2021 ORDERING that on or before 9/22/2021, Plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $48.82 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Randall Blue and Warden at Oshkosh Correctional Institution)(jm)
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Randall Blue. (tlf)
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Randall Blue. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (tlf)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from the Clerk to Randall Blue regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Randall Blue re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Randall Blue. (lh)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Randall Blue. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits 1-11)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue v. Eplett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Eplett
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emil Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey T Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Freund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Harris-Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?