Chianelli et al v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Rick L Chianelli, Jean A Chianelli, West Bend Mutual Insurance Company and Xavier Becerra
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot USA Inc and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2021cv01008
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Brett H Ludwig
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2021 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Home Depot USA Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Paider, Katelyn)
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (LeClere, Kyle)
October 1, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to Involuntary Plaintiff Xavier Becerra requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (lz)
October 1, 2021 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Defendants Whirlpool Corporation and Home Depot USA Inc requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. (lz)
October 1, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Brett H Ludwig. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case. (lz)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Whirlpool Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Burnett, George)
September 10, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rossman, Ashley)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. (Rossman, Ashley)
September 9, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff West Bend Mutual Insurance Company requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (lz)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley M Rossman on behalf of West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Ashley M. Rossman (Rossman, Ashley)
September 7, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to defendant Home Depot USA Inc requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (lz)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Paider, Katelyn)
September 3, 2021 Filing 7 Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Paider, Katelyn)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn E Paider on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Katelyn Paider (Paider, Katelyn)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jean A Chianelli, Rick L Chianelli. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Hockers, Michelle)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 ATTACHMENTS Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Agreement to Join Removal by Whirlpool Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Burnett, George)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Whirlpool Corporation. (Burnett, George)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Whirlpool Corporation.(Burnett, George)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Whirlpool Corporation from Washington County Circuit Court, Case Number: 21-CV-364 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3905039) (Attachments: #1 A - Summons and Complaint, #2 B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burnett, George)
August 27, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chianelli et al v. Whirlpool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick L Chianelli
Represented By: Michelle M Hockers
Represented By: Thadd J Llaurado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean A Chianelli
Represented By: Michelle M Hockers
Represented By: Thadd J Llaurado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick D McNally
Represented By: Ashley M Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Gregory J Haanstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: George Burnett
Represented By: Kyle W LeClere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Inc
Represented By: Katelyn E Paider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?