Jadair International Inc v. American National Property and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jadair International Inc
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company c/o its statutory agent, The Corporation Company and American National Property and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv01103
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2021 09:15 AM in by Telephone before Judge J P Stadtmueller. The court will initiate the call. No later than 12:00 PM the day prior to the hearing, counsel shall notify chambers at 414-297-1122 of the direct telephone number at which they may be reached. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 11/26/2021. (cc: all counsel)(rcm)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 Jadair International, Inc. ANSWER to Counterclaim re #5 Defendant filed by Jadair International Inc. (Murray, James)
November 4, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jadair International Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Murray, James)
October 27, 2021 NOTICE from the clerk to all parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available #here. (amb)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE by American National Property and Casualty Company Certificate of Interest (Klingaman, Russell)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell A Klingaman on behalf of American National Property and Casualty Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Russell A. Klingaman (Klingaman, Russell)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and affirmative defenses, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against American National Property and Casualty Company filed by American National Property and Casualty Company. by American National Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Policy)(Swinick, Corey)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey J Swinick on behalf of American National Property and Casualty Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Corey J. Swinick (Swinick, Corey)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jadair International Inc. American National Property and Casualty Company served on 10/5/2021. (Fetherston, Kevin)
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jadair International Inc. (Murray, James)
September 22, 2021 Summons Issued as to American National Property and Casualty Company. (amb)
September 22, 2021 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The description of the attachments on the complaint contains duplicate text. Most documents on the drop-down list do not need further description. If you want to add a description, do not retype the same words into the description box. For example, if you choose Summons from the drop-down list then you may use the description box to the type in the name of the party to whom the summons is directed but you do not need to type the word summons. This document does not need to be re-filed Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (amb)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Jadair International Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3926052) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, James)
September 21, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jadair International Inc v. American National Property and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jadair International Inc
Represented By: James T Murray, Jr
Represented By: Douglas Desjardins
Represented By: Kevin M Fetherston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company c/o its statutory agent, The Corporation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Corey J Swinick
Represented By: Russell A Klingaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?