Bentley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Savannah Bentley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2021cv01134
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Stephen C Dries
Referring Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 10/15/2021. (cav)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Godfrey on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney(s) appearing: Jean Godfrey (Godfrey, Jean)
October 21, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail for service on Commissioner of Social Security. (tlf)
October 14, 2021 Filing 9 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 12/13/2021;Plaintiff's brief due 1/24/2022;Defendant's response due 3/7/2022;Plaintiff's reply due 3/22/2022. (cc: all counsel) (asc)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries for all further proceedings. Judge William C Griesbach no longer assigned to case signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/13/2021. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 10/4/2021 granting #3 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the Commissioner of Social Security. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
October 4, 2021 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (lh)
October 3, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Savannah Bentley. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Skaar, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Savannah Bentley. (Skaar, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Savannah Bentley. (Skaar, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Savannah Bentley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Unfavorable ALJ Decision, #3 Appeals Council Denial)(Skaar, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bentley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah Bentley
Represented By: Daniel A Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Jean Marie Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?