Marvin v. Kia America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stefanie Marvin and Katherine Wargin
Defendant: Kia America, Inc., Hyundai Motor America and Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01146
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/8/2021 re #13 Stipulation and #14 Joint Motion to Approve Stipulation. The court GRANTS the joint motion and APPROVES the stipulation. The court ORDERS that the defendants' response to the plaintiffs' motion and supporting memorandum to join additional class representatives is due by the end of the day on December 15, 2021 as part of their response to the amended complaint; the plaintiffs may file any reply by the end of the day on February 7, 2021. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Order Approving Stipulation by Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brody, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION by Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. (Brody, Michael)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Stefanie Marvin, Katherine Wargin. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Amended Complaint (Unredacted), #2 Exhibit A - Fed. Reg 1968, #3 Exhibit B - Fed. Reg. 2006, #4 Exhibit C - Fed Reg. 2004, #5 Exhibit D - Kia Warranty, #6 Exhibit E - Kia Marketing Materials, #7 Exhibit F - Hyundai Warranty, #8 Exhibit G - Hyundai Marketing Material, #9 Exhibit H - Fed. Reg. 1997, #10 Exhibit I - Fed. Reg. 2021, #11 Exhibit J - Aldermen Ltr. to Kia, #12 Exhibit K - Aldermen Ltr. to Hyundai, #13 Exhibit L - Azera Petition, #14 Exhibit M - Genesis Petition, #15 Exhibit N - Amanti Petition, #16 Exhibit O - Young Article, #17 Exhibit P - Mustang Petition, #18 Exhibit Q - Equus Petition, #19 Exhibit R - Ioniq Petition, #20 Exhibit S - Niro Petition)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Barton, James)
November 4, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Restrict Document Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Barton, James)
November 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Add Party Proposed Class Representatives by All Plaintiffs. (Barton, James)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vaughn E Olson on behalf of Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Vaughn E. Olson (Olson, Vaughn)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Brennan on behalf of Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Peter J. Brennan (Brennan, Peter)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Greenberg, Joshua)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brody, Michael)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/13/2021 re #3 Stipulation and #4 Joint Motion to Approve Stipulation. The court GRANTS the parties' motion and APPROVES the stipulation regarding scheduling. The court ORDERS that the plaintiffs will file an amended complaint by November 4, 2021; the defendants will respond to the amended complaint, by motion or otherwise, by December 15, 2021; the plaintiffs will file a response to any motion by February 7, 2022; the defendants will file any reply by February 28, 2022. Along with their amended complaint, the plaintiffs will file a motion to seal all or portions of the amended complaint by November 4, 2021; the defendants will file any response to the motion to seal by December 15, 2021; the plaintiffs will file any reply in support of the motion to seal by January 17, 2022. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Order Approving Stipulation by Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brody, Michael)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION by Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. (Brody, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc.. (Brody, Michael)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc., Hyundai Motor America, Kia America, Inc. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2021CV003759 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3938412) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Sealed Unredacted Complaint and Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Redacted Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - State Court Motion to Seal Briefing, #5 Exhibit D - State Court Confidential Disclosure of Information Form, #6 Exhibit E - Proof of Service)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Brody, Michael)
October 5, 2021 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvin v. Kia America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefanie Marvin
Represented By: James B Barton
Represented By: Joshua Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Wargin
Represented By: James B Barton
Represented By: Joshua Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T Brody
Represented By: Peter J Brennan
Represented By: Vaughn E Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Michael T Brody
Represented By: Peter J Brennan
Represented By: Vaughn E Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai America Technical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T Brody
Represented By: Peter J Brennan
Represented By: Vaughn E Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?